Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 3753 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17159 Week
» 70175 Month
» 189702 Year
» 3216555 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
1086 |
m/e |
05/1927 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8971 |
on |
27/01/1946 |
British Railways |
68971 |
m/e |
12/1948 |
Departmental |
15 |
m/e |
09/1962 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
J50 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
309 |
Works Number |
1668 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 05/1927 |
Withdrawal |
During 09/1962 |
Service Life |
35 yrs, 4 mths , 1 dy |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
34B |
Hornsey |
4w/e |
01/11/1952 |
ALLOC |
34E |
New England |
4w/e |
05/08/1961 |
ALLOC |
36A |
Doncaster |
6w/e |
09/06/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
28/11/1953 |
Darlington Works |
North Road have cut up 65022 an 65497 from E.R. also 'Sentinel' 8137 (still L.N.E.R. lettering and numbers). Waiting Works are: 68035/923/68/71, 61017/60/71, 61214/55, 61422, 62773, 63357/72, 63468, 67635/69, 67761/6/7, 69783, 90016/55/162/8/430/4/633/96. 67669 is dual fitted. 69783 has a chimney like the old A6 class carried. |
SLS/195402 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1927 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1086 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1668 |
|
|
27/01/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8971 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Frodingham (FRO) |
|
|
12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68971 |
|
|
01/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hornsey (34B) |
|
|
15/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hornsey (34B) |
|
|
15/07/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (34E) |
|
|
09/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
09/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 15 |
|
|
09/1962 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 15 |
|
|