Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 2732 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16138 Week
» 69154 Month
» 188681 Year
» 3215534 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
3240 |
m/e |
06/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8939 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
British Railways |
68939 |
m/e |
09/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
J50 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
300 |
Works Number |
1599 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 06/1924 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 29/10/1962 |
Service Life |
38 yrs, 4 mths , 28 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
06/1924 |
ARD |
|
Ardsley |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
56A |
|
Wakefield |
w/e |
28/02/1959 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
29/10/1962 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
56A |
Wakefield |
4w/e |
21/03/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
29/10/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1924 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3240 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1599 |
|
|
06/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8939 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Ardsley (ARD) |
|
|
09/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68939 |
|
|
28/02/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wakefield (56A) |
|
|
29/10/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68939 |
|
|