|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cowlairs Works | 24/08/1943 | 24/09/1943 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 2686 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 05/06/1944 | 08/07/1944 | 34 days | Heavy | Boiler number 27525 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 07/10/1944 | 21/10/1944 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 23/06/1946 | 20/07/1946 | 28 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 14/09/1947 | 22/11/1947 | 70 days | General | Boiler number 27556 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 08/12/1950 | 30/12/1950 | 23 days | Heavy Intermediate | Renumbered to BR 64978 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 10/02/1951 | 09/03/1951 | 28 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 05/03/1954 | 08/04/1954 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 27595 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gateshead Works | 10/03/1955 | 25/05/1955 | 77 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 14/08/1958 | 20/09/1958 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 27501 (Diagram 97) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
24/04/1941 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3088 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1856 Allocated to St Margarets (STM) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
24/08/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 24/08/1943. Dep: 24/09/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2686 (Diagram 97) |
||
22/11/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
05/06/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy) - Arr: 05/06/1944. Dep: 08/07/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27525 (Diagram 97) |
||
07/10/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/10/1944. Dep: 21/10/1944. | ||
26/03/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4978 | ||
23/06/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 23/06/1946. Dep: 20/07/1946. | ||
14/09/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 14/09/1947. Dep: 22/11/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27556 (Diagram 97) |
||
01/03/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
06/03/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
20/03/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL) | ||
26/03/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL) | ||
08/12/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 08/12/1950. Dep: 30/12/1950. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 64978 |
||
10/02/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/02/1951. Dep: 09/03/1951. | ||
05/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 05/03/1954. Dep: 08/04/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27595 (Diagram 97) |
||
19/09/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Northallerton (51J) | ||
10/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/03/1955. Dep: 25/05/1955. | ||
18/11/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Auckland (51F) | ||
14/08/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 14/08/1958. Dep: 20/09/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27501 (Diagram 97) |
||
23/08/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
03/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64978 from Gateshead (52A) | ||
07/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |