|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 10/11/1937 | 12/11/1937 | 3 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 29/10/1938 | 09/12/1938 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 2950 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 23/07/1940 | 27/08/1940 | 36 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 23/01/1943 | 20/02/1943 | 29 days | General | Boiler number BP144 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gateshead Works | 07/12/1944 | 28/12/1944 | 22 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 27/07/1946 | 31/08/1946 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 3196 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 19/10/1947 | 27/12/1947 | 70 days | General | Boiler number 2573 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 18/04/1950 | 13/05/1950 | 26 days | Light Intermediate | Renumbered to BR 64917 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 15/05/1951 | 02/06/1951 | 19 days | Heavy Casual | Boiler number 27506 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 14/01/1954 | 18/02/1954 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 27583 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 22/02/1954 | 26/02/1954 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 04/03/1954 | 08/03/1954 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 17/01/1958 | 08/02/1958 | 23 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Inverurie Works | 08/03/1961 | 19/04/1961 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 27573 (Diagram 97) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/04/1950 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works during April: These included Nos. 60529, 61103/72, 61738/68, 61854, 61909/83, 62423, 2430, 62436, 2475, 62479, 3143, 4544, 64593, 64849/54, 4865/68, 64899, 4917, 65921, 7469, 8458, 8550, 9151/62, 69174, 9182, 69553, 90071, 90306, ex-L.M.S. 2835, 42909/18, ex-W.D. 77087, 77107, 77302/99. | SLS/195006 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
23/10/1936 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1536 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 6814 Allocated to Gorton (GOR) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
18/11/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
19/11/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
10/11/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/11/1937. Dep: 12/11/1937. | ||
29/10/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/10/1938. Dep: 09/12/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2950 (Diagram 97) |
||
23/07/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/07/1940. Dep: 27/08/1940. | ||
23/01/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/01/1943. Dep: 20/02/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number BP144 (Diagram 97) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
27/07/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) | ||
07/12/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/12/1944. Dep: 28/12/1944. | ||
17/03/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4917 | ||
27/07/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 27/07/1946. Dep: 31/08/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3196 (Diagram 97) |
||
19/10/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 19/10/1947. Dep: 27/12/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2573 (Diagram 97) |
||
23/10/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tweedmouth (TWD) | ||
29/10/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tweedmouth (TWD) | ||
18/04/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 18/04/1950. Dep: 13/05/1950. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 64917 |
||
15/05/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 15/05/1951. Dep: 02/06/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27506 (Diagram 97) |
||
14/01/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 14/01/1954. Dep: 18/02/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27583 (Diagram 97) |
||
22/02/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/02/1954. Dep: 26/02/1954. | ||
04/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/03/1954. Dep: 08/03/1954. | ||
17/01/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 17/01/1958. Dep: 08/02/1958. | ||
08/03/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Inverurie Works (General) - Arr: 08/03/1961. Dep: 19/04/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27573 (Diagram 97) |
||
09/09/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Alnmouth (52d) | ||
03/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64917 from Alnmouth (52D.1) | ||
07/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |