|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 06/11/1938 | 10/12/1938 | 35 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/06/1941 | 27/08/1941 | 84 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/04/1944 | 17/06/1944 | 61 days | General | Boiler number 2287 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/07/1945 | 06/10/1945 | 69 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 10/03/1946 | 18/04/1946 | 40 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 26/09/1946 | 08/03/1947 | 164 days | General | Boiler number 2660 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4902 |
||
Gorton Works | 20/04/1949 | 18/06/1949 | 60 days | General | Boiler number 3169 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64902 |
||
Derby Works | 30/05/1952 | 08/07/1952 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 27703 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/07/1955 | 17/09/1955 | 53 days | General | Boiler number 27792 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/09/1955 | 13/10/1955 | 17 days | Unclassified |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
14/08/1936 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2998 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1675 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
11/09/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
06/11/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/11/1938. Dep: 10/12/1938. | ||
30/06/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
05/06/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/06/1941. Dep: 27/08/1941. | ||
18/04/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/04/1944. Dep: 17/06/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2287 (Diagram 97) |
||
30/07/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
30/07/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/07/1945. Dep: 06/10/1945. | ||
10/03/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/03/1946. Dep: 18/04/1946. | ||
26/09/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/09/1946. Dep: 08/03/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2660 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4902 |
||
20/04/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/04/1949. Dep: 18/06/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3169 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64902 |
||
30/05/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (General) - Arr: 30/05/1952. Dep: 08/07/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27703 (Diagram 97) |
||
05/10/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Spital Bridge (35C) | ||
01/11/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Spital Bridge (35C) | ||
27/07/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/07/1955. Dep: 17/09/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27792 (Diagram 97) |
||
27/09/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/09/1955. Dep: 13/10/1955. | ||
25/11/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Barnsley (36D) | ||
03/01/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (41F) | ||
11/03/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64902 from Mexborough (41F) | ||
04/1960 | Scrapped | Scrapped |