|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 21/07/1939 | 13/09/1939 | 55 days | General | Boiler number 2690 (Diagram 97) |
||
Doncaster Works | 24/08/1941 | 08/11/1941 | 77 days | General | Boiler number 2706 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 03/01/1944 | 12/02/1944 | 41 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 16/07/1944 | 19/08/1944 | 35 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 28/07/1946 | 14/12/1946 | 140 days | General | Boiler number 2094 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4900 |
||
Stratford Works | 07/01/1948 | 20/01/1948 | 14 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 24/04/1948 | 24/06/1948 | 62 days | General | Boiler number 27714 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64900 |
||
Gorton Works | 13/12/1949 | 11/02/1950 | 61 days | General | Boiler number 4985 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/02/1950 | 17/02/1950 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Derby Works | 07/02/1951 | 03/04/1951 | 56 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Derby Works | 06/04/1951 | 13/04/1951 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Stratford Works | 04/06/1953 | 08/08/1953 | 66 days | General | Boiler number 27871 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 16/09/1956 | 26/10/1956 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 27822 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 15/10/1957 | 06/12/1957 | 53 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
28/02/1951 | Derby Works | During February, un-renumbered engines in Works were 7665 (5C), 7453 (10E), 762 (15D), 4409 (17A), 7125 (18A), 3334 (19A), 3449 (20B), 3656 (20D), 3257, 4203/24 (21A), 7567 (25G). Engines received from other regions for attention were (30A) 64781, (32A) 64731, (32B) 64900, (33C) 42505/11, (35C) 44476, (37A) 64760, 64840, (E) 4907, (38A) 64716, 64965, (40A) 64725, 64886, (71G) 44560, (71H) 43194, (84J) 2183, (85B) 2144, (86B) 2033. Engines despatched to other regions after repair include (30A) 64783, (32A) 64802, (32B) 64905, (33A) 42328, (33C) 42506, (35C) 40482, 44518, (36A) 64910/67, (37A) 64751, 64836, 64911, (38A) 64832, (40A) 64730, (71G) 44560, (84G) 43679, (87K) 42385. No. 58246 (LMS.3175) has come off works still with round-topped fire-box. The following withdrawn engines were cut up in February: 22853, 41012, 41962, 762, 41824, 43811; while Nos. 41011, 41955/60/3-5/8 and Crane 58865 were in the yard. Stored, near station: 40411/6, 40632, 41000/60, 43200/59, 43361/70, 43429. No. 43226 is in for special examination, and may be condemned. At the end of the month, Nos. 407, 40418 an 40513, which have been in store for some time near the station, were returned to traffic. |
SLS/195104 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/02/1904 | Modification | Diagram 97 number 2216 boiler fitted | ||
05/08/1936 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2996 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1673 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
04/09/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ipswich (IPS) | ||
15/01/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Yarmouth South Town (YAR) | ||
14/05/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) | ||
02/07/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ipswich (IPS) | ||
21/07/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/07/1939. Dep: 13/09/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2690 (Diagram 97) |
||
24/08/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/08/1941. Dep: 08/11/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2706 (Diagram 97) |
||
03/01/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 03/01/1944. Dep: 12/02/1944. | ||
16/07/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/07/1944. Dep: 19/08/1944. | ||
28/07/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/07/1946. Dep: 14/12/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2094 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4900 |
||
07/01/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/01/1948. Dep: 20/01/1948. | ||
24/04/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/04/1948. Dep: 24/06/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27714 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64900 |
||
13/12/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/12/1949. Dep: 11/02/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4985 (Diagram 97) |
||
16/02/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/02/1950. Dep: 17/02/1950. | ||
07/02/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 07/02/1951. Dep: 03/04/1951. | ||
06/04/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/04/1951. Dep: 13/04/1951. | ||
24/06/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) | ||
30/06/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) | ||
04/06/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 04/06/1953. Dep: 08/08/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27871 (Diagram 97) |
||
07/11/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Melton Constable (32G) | ||
06/03/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) | ||
16/09/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 16/09/1956. Dep: 26/10/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27822 (Diagram 97) |
||
15/10/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/10/1957. Dep: 06/12/1957. | ||
27/07/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64900 from Norwich Thorpe (32A) | ||
09/1959 | Scrapped | Scrapped |