|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 09/10/1937 | 20/11/1937 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 2691 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/11/1940 | 04/01/1941 | 59 days | General | Boiler number 2660 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/06/1943 | 25/09/1943 | 114 days | General | Boiler number 2675 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/10/1943 | 27/10/1943 | 12 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 05/09/1947 | 24/10/1947 | 50 days | General | Boiler number BP145 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/01/1950 | 18/02/1950 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 2104 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64890 |
||
Gorton Works | 22/02/1950 | 02/03/1950 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Derby Works | 28/10/1952 | 30/12/1952 | 64 days | General | Boiler number 27738 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 05/03/1956 | 27/04/1956 | 54 days | General | Boiler number 27786 (Diagram 97) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
13/09/1935 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2986 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1637 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
16/10/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
09/10/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/10/1937. Dep: 20/11/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2691 (Diagram 97) |
||
13/05/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) | ||
07/11/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/11/1940. Dep: 04/01/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2660 (Diagram 97) |
||
04/06/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/06/1943. Dep: 25/09/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2675 (Diagram 97) |
||
16/10/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/10/1943. Dep: 27/10/1943. | ||
24/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4890 | ||
05/09/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/09/1947. Dep: 24/10/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number BP145 (Diagram 97) |
||
09/01/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/01/1950. Dep: 18/02/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2104 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64890 |
||
22/02/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/02/1950. Dep: 02/03/1950. | ||
28/10/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (General) - Arr: 28/10/1952. Dep: 30/12/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27738 (Diagram 97) |
||
17/10/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
25/09/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) | ||
05/03/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 05/03/1956. Dep: 27/04/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27786 (Diagram 97) |
||
12/10/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
07/12/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) | ||
21/03/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64890 from Lincoln (40A) | ||
04/1960 | Scrapped | Scrapped |