|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 02/11/1937 | 27/11/1937 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 2669 (Diagram 97) |
||
Doncaster Works | 30/09/1938 | 20/10/1938 | 21 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/07/1939 | 29/07/1939 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 20/07/1940 | 17/08/1940 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 2193 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/05/1943 | 20/05/1943 | 9 days | General | Boiler number 2669 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/09/1945 | 04/10/1945 | 6 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 24/04/1947 | 07/05/1947 | 14 days | General | Boiler number 2203 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/02/1948 | 1 day | Light Casual | ||||
Gorton Works | 20/08/1949 | 1 day | Light Casual | ||||
Derby Works | 22/02/1951 | 12/04/1951 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 27800 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64886 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 09/02/1954 | 06/03/1954 | 26 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 30/08/1956 | 13/10/1956 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 27565 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/04/1960 | 03/06/1960 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 27836 (Diagram 97) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
28/02/1951 | Derby Works | During February, un-renumbered engines in Works were 7665 (5C), 7453 (10E), 762 (15D), 4409 (17A), 7125 (18A), 3334 (19A), 3449 (20B), 3656 (20D), 3257, 4203/24 (21A), 7567 (25G). Engines received from other regions for attention were (30A) 64781, (32A) 64731, (32B) 64900, (33C) 42505/11, (35C) 44476, (37A) 64760, 64840, (E) 4907, (38A) 64716, 64965, (40A) 64725, 64886, (71G) 44560, (71H) 43194, (84J) 2183, (85B) 2144, (86B) 2033. Engines despatched to other regions after repair include (30A) 64783, (32A) 64802, (32B) 64905, (33A) 42328, (33C) 42506, (35C) 40482, 44518, (36A) 64910/67, (37A) 64751, 64836, 64911, (38A) 64832, (40A) 64730, (71G) 44560, (84G) 43679, (87K) 42385. No. 58246 (LMS.3175) has come off works still with round-topped fire-box. The following withdrawn engines were cut up in February: 22853, 41012, 41962, 762, 41824, 43811; while Nos. 41011, 41955/60/3-5/8 and Crane 58865 were in the yard. Stored, near station: 40411/6, 40632, 41000/60, 43200/59, 43361/70, 43429. No. 43226 is in for special examination, and may be condemned. At the end of the month, Nos. 407, 40418 an 40513, which have been in store for some time near the station, were returned to traffic. |
SLS/195104 |
19/04/1954 | Wetherby Races, Easter Monday | Excursion trains between Leeds City and Wetherby Racecourse station on Easter Monday were well filled and worked by the following J39's from Neville Hill (50B):-64791, 64819/35/86, 64920/22/33/35/43, and also brought in D49 62748 (50B). The excursions from Bradford and Harrogate brought in 62746/58/62 (all 50D), whilst two trains from the Huddersfield area were worked by 45218 (25A) and 42863 (25B). The excursion from Heeley (Sheffield) was, however, worked by 45015 (3B-Bushbury), rather a far cry from Wolverhampton. In addition, the 4.28 p.m. ordinary passenger service from Leeds City to Church Fenton via Wetherby, hauled by 61256 (50B), called specially at Wetherby Racecourse station to pick up. | SLS/195406 |
10/03/1963 | Ardsley MPD (Stored) | Stored at Ardsley on 10th March-60036/69/70/7/80/92/125, 61068/310, 64719/49/54/6/60/96/859/79/86/911/8/69, 67742/63/5/6/77. | SLS/196304 |
01/04/1963 | Washingborough Junction (Stored) | The Washingborough Junc.- Pelham St. Junc, section of the Boston-Lincoln line has been taken out of use; trains now use the former avoiding line from Washingborough Junc. (s.b. now closed) to Greetwell Junc. and the GN/GE Joint line thence to Lincoln Central. | SLS/196304 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
30/08/1935 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2982 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1631 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
07/12/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
30/01/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
02/11/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/11/1937. Dep: 27/11/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2669 (Diagram 97) |
||
30/09/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/09/1938. Dep: 20/10/1938. | ||
22/07/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/07/1939. Dep: 29/07/1939. | ||
04/08/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
23/02/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
20/07/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/07/1940. Dep: 17/08/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2193 (Diagram 97) |
||
18/01/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
12/05/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/05/1943. Dep: 20/05/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2669 (Diagram 97) |
||
29/09/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/09/1945. Dep: 04/10/1945. | ||
13/10/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET) | ||
10/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4886 | ||
24/04/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/04/1947. Dep: 07/05/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2203 (Diagram 97) |
||
21/02/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/02/1948. | ||
10/04/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP) | ||
16/04/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP) | ||
20/08/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/08/1949. | ||
04/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) | ||
22/02/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (General) - Arr: 22/02/1951. Dep: 12/04/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27800 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64886 |
||
02/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B) | ||
08/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B) | ||
09/02/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 09/02/1954. Dep: 06/03/1954. | ||
30/08/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 30/08/1956. Dep: 13/10/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27565 (Diagram 97) |
||
15/09/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (56G) | ||
12/01/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Low Moor (56F) | ||
19/04/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/04/1960. Dep: 03/06/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27836 (Diagram 97) |
||
18/11/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (56B) | ||
27/11/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64886 from Ardsley (56B) | ||
09/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |