|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 15/09/1937 | 16/10/1937 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 2318 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/09/1940 | 02/11/1940 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 2696 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/10/1943 | 08/01/1944 | 83 days | General | Boiler number 2121 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 09/12/1946 | 26/02/1947 | 80 days | General | Boiler number 2109 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4878 |
||
Gorton Works | 16/06/1949 | 20/08/1949 | 66 days | General | Boiler number 27698 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64878 |
||
Gorton Works | 06/09/1949 | 13/09/1949 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Derby Works | 11/04/1952 | 25/05/1952 | 45 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Gorton Works | 06/08/1954 | 18/09/1954 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 27684 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/09/1954 | 24/09/1954 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 09/03/1957 | 13/04/1957 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 25839 (Diagram 97) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
19/02/1961 | Doncaster Works (Stripping Road) | New Erecting Shop: D3063, D2385-9, E3056-61. New Erecting Shop Yard: E3062. Scrap Road: DEPT2, DEPT9, 61766, 64231, 68623, 68875, 68930/47/79, 69574. Stripping Road: D3452/85, 60010/23/92, 60118/36/40, 60529, 61950, 63943, 64878/85, 68943, 76032. Erecting Shop: D2233, D2402, D3165, D3575, D3630, D8210, 43081, 60030/1/68, 60103/10/29/39, 60521, 61138, 61254, 61313/8, 61807, 61901/13/61, 62032/50, 63926/86, 73001. Outside Erecting Shop: 60021/41, 61150, 61234, 61926, 63964, 73096. Crimpsall: 60133, 62039. Paint Shop: D318/33, D5686/7, D6708/9, D8046, 43152, 60514/34, 61096, 70054. Outside Paint Shop: 60124, 60522, 61165, 61954. Works Shunters: DEPT10 (ex-68911), DEPT11 (ex-68914), 68977. | SLS/196104 |
17/03/1963 | Carlisle Canal MPD (Stored) | Stored at Carlisle Canal-42067/98, 42449, 42720/52/5, 42835/6, 43045/139, 47520, 61064, 64499, 64877/8/95/9, 65237 an 69155. | SLS/196304 |
29/04/1963 | Coventry (Stored) | On 29th April a Cathedral special from Newcastle was worked throughout by Peak D192 (52A) instead of the usual V2; three of latter class failed on similar specials during April. On lst May, 70035 (40B) worked a special evening coke train from Coventry Gas Works to Immingham. Commencing April, a twice weekly car train is scheduled to run between the new Rootes factory at Linwood and the Rootes factory at Coventry; the trains run to Gosford Green goods station (Coventry avoiding line) arriving at 3-45 a.m. and are worked throughout by two Polmadie Type 1 d/es which then run to Rugby, l.e., and return from Gosford Green at 5 p.m. Since running, D8119-8128 have all been noted on this turn. | SLS/196304 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/07/1935 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2947 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1623 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
09/08/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) | ||
15/09/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/09/1937. Dep: 16/10/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2318 (Diagram 97) |
||
12/09/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/09/1940. Dep: 02/11/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2696 (Diagram 97) |
||
18/10/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/10/1943. Dep: 08/01/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2121 (Diagram 97) |
||
09/12/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 09/12/1946. Dep: 26/02/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2109 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4878 |
||
16/06/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/06/1949. Dep: 20/08/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27698 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64878 |
||
06/09/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/09/1949. Dep: 13/09/1949. | ||
11/04/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 11/04/1952. Dep: 25/05/1952. | ||
06/08/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/08/1954. Dep: 18/09/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27684 (Diagram 97) |
||
23/09/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/09/1954. Dep: 24/09/1954. | ||
09/03/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/03/1957. Dep: 13/04/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 25839 (Diagram 97) |
||
18/02/1961 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64878 from Sheffield Darnall (SHF) | ||
03/1961 | Scrapped | Scrapped |