|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 29/04/1938 | 11/06/1938 | 44 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 14/06/1940 | 10/07/1940 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 2129 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 12/07/1940 | 30/07/1940 | 19 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 19/01/1943 | 17/02/1943 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 2723 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 25/08/1945 | 06/10/1945 | 43 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 05/10/1946 | 19/10/1946 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 15/03/1948 | 27/04/1948 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 2622 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64862 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 27/02/1951 | 31/03/1951 | 33 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 26/01/1952 | 26/02/1952 | 32 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 23/08/1954 | 18/09/1954 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 27460 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 05/10/1954 | 08/10/1954 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 14/10/1954 | 23/10/1954 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 23/01/1957 | 23/02/1957 | 32 days | Light Intermediate |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/11/1935 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1464 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1648 Allocated to Neville Hill (NEV) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
25/10/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Starbeck (SBK) | ||
29/04/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/04/1938. Dep: 11/06/1938. | ||
14/06/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/06/1940. Dep: 10/07/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2129 (Diagram 97) |
||
12/07/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/07/1940. Dep: 30/07/1940. | ||
19/01/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/01/1943. Dep: 17/02/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2723 (Diagram 97) |
||
25/08/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 25/08/1945. Dep: 06/10/1945. | ||
14/01/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
05/10/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/10/1946. Dep: 19/10/1946. | ||
05/01/1947 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4862 | ||
15/03/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 15/03/1948. Dep: 27/04/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2622 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64862 |
||
12/12/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL) | ||
18/12/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL) | ||
25/02/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (51D) | ||
27/02/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 27/02/1951. Dep: 31/03/1951. | ||
03/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (51D) | ||
26/01/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 26/01/1952. Dep: 26/02/1952. | ||
14/09/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C) | ||
04/10/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C) | ||
23/08/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 23/08/1954. Dep: 18/09/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27460 (Diagram 97) |
||
05/10/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/10/1954. Dep: 08/10/1954. | ||
14/10/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/10/1954. Dep: 23/10/1954. | ||
06/03/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Auckland (51F) | ||
23/01/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 23/01/1957. Dep: 23/02/1957. | ||
22/10/1961 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64862 from West Auckland (51F) | ||
12/1961 | Scrapped | Scrapped |