|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 16/10/1934 | 13/11/1934 | 29 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 05/08/1937 | 03/09/1937 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 1909 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 21/09/1939 | 03/11/1939 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 2141 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/11/1939 | 27/11/1939 | 19 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 17/01/1942 | 26/01/1942 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 29/06/1942 | 08/08/1942 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 27535 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 19/01/1945 | 10/02/1945 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 2625 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 15/02/1947 | 05/04/1947 | 50 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 04/06/1948 | 29/06/1948 | 26 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 31/01/1949 | 26/03/1949 | 55 days | General | Renumbered to BR 64843 |
||
Inverurie Works | 27/09/1951 | 09/11/1951 | 44 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 07/04/1953 | 14/05/1953 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 27540 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 16/12/1954 | 31/12/1954 | 16 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 27/04/1956 | 26/05/1956 | 30 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 30/07/1958 | 06/09/1958 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 27486 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 08/12/1960 | 29/12/1960 | 22 days | Light Casual |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/10/1932 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1469 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1559 Allocated to Neville Hill (NEV) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
16/10/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/10/1934. Dep: 13/11/1934. | ||
05/08/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/08/1937. Dep: 03/09/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1909 (Diagram 97) |
||
21/09/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/09/1939. Dep: 03/11/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2141 (Diagram 97) |
||
09/11/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/11/1939. Dep: 27/11/1939. | ||
17/01/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/01/1942. Dep: 26/01/1942. | ||
29/06/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/06/1942. Dep: 08/08/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27535 (Diagram 97) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haverton Hill (HAV) | ||
19/06/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) | ||
19/01/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 19/01/1945. Dep: 10/02/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2625 (Diagram 97) |
||
27/10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4843 | ||
15/02/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 15/02/1947. Dep: 05/04/1947. | ||
04/06/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/06/1948. Dep: 29/06/1948. | ||
31/01/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 31/01/1949. Dep: 26/03/1949. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 64843 |
||
05/06/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tweedmouth (TWD) | ||
11/06/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tweedmouth (TWD) | ||
27/09/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 27/09/1951. Dep: 09/11/1951. | ||
07/04/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 07/04/1953. Dep: 14/05/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27540 (Diagram 97) |
||
16/12/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/12/1954. Dep: 31/12/1954. | ||
27/04/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 27/04/1956. Dep: 26/05/1956. | ||
30/07/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 30/07/1958. Dep: 06/09/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27486 (Diagram 97) |
||
08/12/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/12/1960. Dep: 29/12/1960. | ||
20/08/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sunderland (52G) | ||
29/03/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64843 from Sunderland (52G) | ||
03/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |