|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 16/03/1932 | 23/03/1932 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 06/04/1934 | 05/05/1934 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 8588 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/11/1936 | 05/12/1936 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 8003 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/11/1939 | 30/12/1939 | 57 days | General | Boiler number 8017 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/07/1942 | 22/08/1942 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 2776 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/03/1943 | 23/07/1943 | 138 days | Light Repair | After collision |
||
Gorton Works | 29/01/1945 | 07/04/1945 | 69 days | General | Boiler number 2214 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 02/01/1946 | 06/04/1946 | 95 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 08/11/1948 | 08/01/1949 | 62 days | General | Boiler number 27759 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64836 |
||
Derby Works | 21/12/1950 | 19/02/1951 | 61 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Gorton Works | 22/12/1952 | 28/02/1953 | 69 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 03/03/1953 | 07/03/1953 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 14/03/1953 | 01/04/1953 | 19 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 10/04/1953 | 08/05/1953 | 29 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 22/05/1953 | 20/06/1953 | 30 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 23/06/1953 | 26/06/1953 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 13/11/1954 | 24/12/1954 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 27699 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/06/1955 | 27/08/1955 | 59 days | Light Casual | After collision |
||
Gorton Works | 29/04/1958 | 07/06/1958 | 40 days | General | Not repaired Boiler number 27523 (Diagram 97) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
13/01/1951 | Derby Works | During the period ended 13/1/51, the following unrenumbered engines have appeared for Works: for special examination, 1377 (19B) and 530 (22B); for attention, 7236 (19A), 7502 (18D), 3392 (20B), 22944 (16A), 7165 (28B), 7572 (25A), 3679 (84G). Cut up, 20155 (14/12). New 2-6-4T on trial, 42065 . 10000, 10001 an 10800 were receiving attention in the diesel shop. Apart from the usual Derby types, the following were in evidence: 64714 (39A), 64730 (40A), 64832 (38A), 64967 (37A), 2043 (LYD), 64783 (30A), 64836 (37A), also the following 'outsiders'-42502 (33C), 42509/29/30 (33A), 43757 (84G), 47479 (87K), 40482 an 43957 (35C), 41824 (87K), 42506 (33A), 42385 (87K). The following came off still lettered 'British Railways'-42388, 64727, 41853 (round-top firebox), 47576, 42342, 41905 (lined); and others still 'L.M.S.' !! 41534, 44186, 41196, 42533, 40032, 47503, 44339, 40928, 42387, 42530, 43627, 44103 (after three years of British Railways). No. 10100 was on trial on 9/1/51, when 10000/1 were still in the diesel shop. The following are stored near the station: 407, 40418, 40513, 40632, 43200/59, 43361, 43429. Old engines fresh off works include 2053 and 2112 (0-6-0PT), 40454, 40463, 43627, 43790, 58062, 58159, 58162. Those repainted with emblem include 64734, 64805/41/93 an 43846 with a L.M.S. standard 0-8-0 tender. | SLS/195102 |
28/02/1951 | Derby Works | During February, un-renumbered engines in Works were 7665 (5C), 7453 (10E), 762 (15D), 4409 (17A), 7125 (18A), 3334 (19A), 3449 (20B), 3656 (20D), 3257, 4203/24 (21A), 7567 (25G). Engines received from other regions for attention were (30A) 64781, (32A) 64731, (32B) 64900, (33C) 42505/11, (35C) 44476, (37A) 64760, 64840, (E) 4907, (38A) 64716, 64965, (40A) 64725, 64886, (71G) 44560, (71H) 43194, (84J) 2183, (85B) 2144, (86B) 2033. Engines despatched to other regions after repair include (30A) 64783, (32A) 64802, (32B) 64905, (33A) 42328, (33C) 42506, (35C) 40482, 44518, (36A) 64910/67, (37A) 64751, 64836, 64911, (38A) 64832, (40A) 64730, (71G) 44560, (84G) 43679, (87K) 42385. No. 58246 (LMS.3175) has come off works still with round-topped fire-box. The following withdrawn engines were cut up in February: 22853, 41012, 41962, 762, 41824, 43811; while Nos. 41011, 41955/60/3-5/8 and Crane 58865 were in the yard. Stored, near station: 40411/6, 40632, 41000/60, 43200/59, 43361/70, 43429. No. 43226 is in for special examination, and may be condemned. At the end of the month, Nos. 407, 40418 an 40513, which have been in store for some time near the station, were returned to traffic. |
SLS/195104 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/03/1932 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2975 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1544 Allocated to Annesley (ANN) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
16/03/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/03/1932. Dep: 23/03/1932. | ||
04/04/1932 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (LEI) | ||
06/04/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/04/1934. Dep: 05/05/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8588 (Diagram 97) |
||
10/11/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/11/1936. Dep: 05/12/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8003 (Diagram 97) |
||
04/11/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/11/1939. Dep: 30/12/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8017 (Diagram 97) |
||
02/03/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
12/07/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/07/1942. Dep: 22/08/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2776 (Diagram 97) |
||
08/03/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/03/1943. Dep: 23/07/1943. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
09/08/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
29/01/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/01/1945. Dep: 07/04/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2214 (Diagram 97) |
||
02/01/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 02/01/1946. Dep: 06/04/1946. | ||
18/08/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
18/08/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4836 | ||
08/11/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/11/1948. Dep: 08/01/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27759 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64836 |
||
21/12/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 21/12/1950. Dep: 19/02/1951. | ||
22/12/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 22/12/1952. Dep: 28/02/1953. | ||
03/03/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/03/1953. Dep: 07/03/1953. | ||
14/03/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/03/1953. Dep: 01/04/1953. | ||
10/04/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/04/1953. Dep: 08/05/1953. | ||
22/05/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/05/1953. Dep: 20/06/1953. | ||
23/06/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/06/1953. Dep: 26/06/1953. | ||
13/11/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/11/1954. Dep: 24/12/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27699 (Diagram 97) |
||
30/06/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 30/06/1955. Dep: 27/08/1955. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
29/04/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/04/1958. Dep: 07/06/1958. Work undertaken: Not repaired Boiler number 27523 (Diagram 97) |
||
25/04/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64836 from Ardsley (56B) | ||
05/1962 | Scrapped | Scrapped |