|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 03/09/1931 | 17/10/1931 | 45 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 30/04/1934 | 19/05/1934 | 20 days | General | Boiler number 8015 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/08/1936 | 19/09/1936 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 1931 (Diagram 97) |
||
Doncaster Works | 25/11/1938 | 23/12/1938 | 29 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 23/05/1940 | 06/07/1940 | 45 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/10/1941 | 13/12/1941 | 50 days | General | |||
Stratford Works | 22/04/1946 | 18/06/1946 | 58 days | Light Repair | |||
Stratford Works | 12/06/1947 | 09/10/1947 | 120 days | General | |||
Stratford Works | 30/12/1947 | 20/01/1948 | 22 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 13/05/1949 | 01/07/1949 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 4972 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64799 |
||
Derby Works | 23/03/1952 | 02/05/1952 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 27432 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 25/01/1955 | 24/02/1955 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 27847 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 10/04/1958 | 09/05/1958 | 30 days | General | Not repaired Boiler number 27711 (Diagram 97) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
30/09/1929 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2773 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1470 Allocated to York (North) (YK) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
09/10/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
03/09/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/09/1931. Dep: 17/10/1931. | ||
30/04/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/04/1934. Dep: 19/05/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8015 (Diagram 97) |
||
17/08/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/08/1936. Dep: 19/09/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1931 (Diagram 97) |
||
25/11/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/11/1938. Dep: 23/12/1938. | ||
23/05/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/05/1940. Dep: 06/07/1940. | ||
25/10/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/10/1941. Dep: 13/12/1941. | ||
29/04/1944 | Modification | Diagram 97 number 2296 boiler fitted | ||
15/04/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) | ||
22/04/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/04/1946. Dep: 18/06/1946. | ||
25/10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4799 | ||
12/06/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 12/06/1947. Dep: 09/10/1947. | ||
12/11/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Yarmouth South Town (YAR) | ||
30/12/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/12/1947. Dep: 20/01/1948. | ||
04/01/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) | ||
10/01/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) | ||
13/05/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/05/1949. Dep: 01/07/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4972 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64799 |
||
30/04/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (37A) | ||
23/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (General) - Arr: 23/03/1952. Dep: 02/05/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27432 (Diagram 97) |
||
27/09/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tuxford (40D) | ||
16/01/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
25/01/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 25/01/1955. Dep: 24/02/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27847 (Diagram 97) |
||
28/10/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (35A) | ||
17/03/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
10/04/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 10/04/1958. Dep: 09/05/1958. Work undertaken: Not repaired Boiler number 27711 (Diagram 97) |
||
27/07/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64799 from Stratford (30A) | ||
09/1959 | Scrapped | Scrapped |