|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 14/03/1932 | 09/04/1932 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 2193 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/10/1934 | 18/10/1934 | 16 days | General | Boiler number 2203 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/11/1936 | 19/12/1936 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 8016 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/01/1939 | 11/02/1939 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 2184 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/01/1940 | 16/03/1940 | 70 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/06/1941 | 14/08/1941 | 68 days | General | |||
Stratford Works | 05/12/1943 | 22/01/1944 | 49 days | General | Boiler number E1355 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 13/07/1945 | 20/08/1945 | 39 days | Light Repair | |||
Stratford Works | 21/04/1946 | 28/08/1946 | 130 days | General | Boiler number 2317 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 01/06/1947 | 29/07/1947 | 59 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 03/10/1948 | 04/12/1948 | 63 days | General | Boiler number 8592 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64798 |
||
Gorton Works | 04/02/1949 | 23/04/1949 | 79 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Derby Works | 29/08/1950 | 10/11/1950 | 74 days | General | Boiler number 2309 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/04/1953 | 16/05/1953 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 27755 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/02/1956 | 24/03/1956 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 27727 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/10/1958 | 22/11/1958 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 27837 (Diagram 97) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
15/09/1950 | Derby Works | For works during first half of September: 40653 4B, 41050/9 14B, 41065 23C, 41118 8E, 42325 14B, 42533 33A, 43754 22B, 43959 18C, 43968 and M4010 21A, 44164 an 44402 17A, 44174 17D, 7588 5C, 7635 22B, 58137 16C, 64883 40A, 40410 35C, 41062 19B, 41068 20A, 1251 (58034) 22B, 42339 16A, 42344 5D, 42345 5C, 43246 an 43435 21A, 43344 22B, 3650 18A, 43819 18A, 43925 20D, 44180 17C, 44355 22A, 7481 87K, 22945 (58136) 20B, 58237 20C, 64757 38A, 64959 32A, 40001 11A, 40351 20A, 426 17A, 41001 22B, 41004 20E, 41006 15C, 41067 20E, 41095 15C, 41154 9E, 1429 (58090) 20C, 42364 5D, 42509 33C, 42512 33C, 3456 20A, 3914 18D, 44598 16A, 47548 19A, 58209 19B, 64798 38E. New Construction: No. 42050 was ex Paint Shop on 6/9, and others up to 42057 were in various stages in the Erecting Shop. Diesels 12074/5 were completed and others up to 12079 in course of construction. No. 42146 was on trials on 6/9. Nos. 404, 40411/6 have gone into traffic ex store, but Nos. 407, 40513, 43342/64, 43482 are in store, near the station. Withdrawn: still in works Yard: 40498, 40515, 41017, 43297, 43818, 22853 (58112), 3511 (58275), 1251 (58034) and 1406 (58079). No. 41748 is ex Works, with round-top firebox. No. 58080 (0-4-4T) has appeared fully lined, with emblem. Among those repainted black with emblem are 2108 (0-6-OPT), and J.39 Nos. 64762/5/84/97, 64903/62/9, while 64906/51 still retain BRITISH RAILWAYS (not repainted). |
SLS/195012 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/09/1929 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2772 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1469 Allocated to York (North) (YK) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
18/09/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ipswich (IPS) | ||
14/03/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/03/1932. Dep: 09/04/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2193 (Diagram 97) |
||
09/05/1932 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
03/10/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/10/1934. Dep: 18/10/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2203 (Diagram 97) |
||
26/11/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/11/1936. Dep: 19/12/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8016 (Diagram 97) |
||
21/08/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (PKS) | ||
13/01/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/01/1939. Dep: 11/02/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2184 (Diagram 97) |
||
26/03/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
20/10/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
07/01/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/01/1940. Dep: 16/03/1940. | ||
08/06/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/06/1941. Dep: 14/08/1941. | ||
28/05/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
05/12/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 05/12/1943. Dep: 22/01/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number E1355 (Diagram 97) |
||
13/09/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) | ||
13/07/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/07/1945. Dep: 20/08/1945. | ||
21/04/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 21/04/1946. Dep: 28/08/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2317 (Diagram 97) |
||
09/10/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Yarmouth South Town (YAR) | ||
31/10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4798 | ||
10/12/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) | ||
01/06/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/06/1947. Dep: 29/07/1947. | ||
12/10/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Yarmouth South Town (YAR) | ||
12/11/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) | ||
03/10/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/10/1948. Dep: 04/12/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8592 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64798 |
||
04/02/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 04/02/1949. Dep: 23/04/1949. | ||
16/04/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E) | ||
29/08/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (General) - Arr: 29/08/1950. Dep: 10/11/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2309 (Diagram 97) |
||
08/10/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
07/04/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/04/1953. Dep: 16/05/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27755 (Diagram 97) |
||
15/02/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/02/1956. Dep: 24/03/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27727 (Diagram 97) |
||
03/11/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (38B) | ||
20/10/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/10/1958. Dep: 22/11/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27837 (Diagram 97) |
||
15/09/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64798 from Annesley (16D) | ||
11/1962 | Scrapped | Scrapped |