|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cowlairs Works | 17/06/1933 | 1 day | General | Boiler number C1719 (Diagram 97) |
|||
Cowlairs Works | 01/12/1934 | 1 day | General | Boiler number C1713 (Diagram 97) |
|||
Cowlairs Works | 11/06/1936 | 1 day | General | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 04/12/1936 | 1 day | Light Repair | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 27/08/1937 | 1 day | General | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 17/06/1939 | 1 day | General | Boiler number C1739 (Diagram 97) |
|||
Cowlairs Works | 01/07/1939 | 1 day | Light Repair | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 07/12/1940 | 1 day | General | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 26/02/1943 | 1 day | Light Repair | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 20/08/1943 | 1 day | Heavy | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 11/12/1943 | 1 day | Light Repair | ||||
Inverurie Works | 07/04/1945 | 05/05/1945 | 29 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 27/04/1946 | 28/05/1946 | 32 days | Heavy | |||
Cowlairs Works | 21/04/1947 | 25/06/1947 | 66 days | General | Boiler number 2636 (Diagram 97) |
||
Inverurie Works | 02/03/1948 | 04/03/1948 | 3 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 13/10/1950 | 04/11/1950 | 23 days | Heavy Intermediate | Renumbered to BR 64795 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 02/03/1954 | 27/03/1954 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 27546 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 05/03/1957 | 06/04/1957 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 27543 (Diagram 97) |
||
Inverurie Works | 04/11/1957 | 06/11/1957 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 26/02/1959 | 1 day | Unclassified | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 25/06/1959 | 30/06/1959 | 6 days | Light Casual | |||
Inverurie Works | 23/01/1961 | 17/03/1961 | 54 days | Heavy Intermediate | A.W.S. fitted |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/12/1946 | Cowlairs Works | The following locos. have recently been fitted with new Cowlairs boilers: Nos. 4499 (1932 of 4/44), 4589 (1885 of 11/41), 4594 (1934 of 5/44), 4599 (1929 of 4/44), 4609 (1951 of 12/44), 5221 (1920 of 12/43), 6329 (1926 of 1/44). All the foregoing are fitted with Pop safety valves and L.N.E.R. type fire doors. No. 4549 (1953 of 4/45) is fitted with a L.N.E. firedoor, and No. 7479 (1990 01/11/46) with a N.B. type firedoor. Nos. 5221, 5329 and 7479 have only one steam pipe in the smokebox, instead of the usual two. No. 4477 has been fitted with a Mark II. graduated brake, whist Nos. 5247 and 5339 have the Mark III. pattern. No. 4795 was fitted with American type injectors in July, 1946. | SLS/194702 |
02/08/1962 | Polmont MPD | In store on 2nd August-40188/9/200, 64795, 67618/29/30/43/62/78, 69188/212/8. 65280 an 69137 were removed during July to Inverurie for scrap. 69126 an 68454/72 were en route Boness dump-Clarkston for scrap on 31st July. | SLS/196209 |
12/06/1963 | Inverurie Works (Awaiting scrapping or shopping) | In Works: 42273, 45176, 61076, 61103, D8032. Shopped in four weeks ending 7th June : 64588, D362, D6155, 44960, 65930, 61404. Scrapped in same period: 64581, 65217/57/304, 64822, 65928; 64499, 65237. Being scrapped: 57617/31, 68346, 90077/575. Awaiting scrapping or shopping-64599/600, 64795, 64950/86. 64946 was waiting at Kittybrewster. | SLS/196307 |
20/07/1963 | Inverurie Works (Scrapped) | Shopped during six weeks ended 20th July: 42273, 45176, 61076/346/402, 64549, 65267/323/908/22/6, D5340, D6140/5/6. Scrapped in same period-57607, 64795/946/86, 65261, 67668, 68445/79. | SLS/196309 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
31/07/1929 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2742 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1466 Allocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (ABD) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
17/06/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 17/06/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number C1719 (Diagram 97) |
||
01/12/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 01/12/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number C1713 (Diagram 97) |
||
11/06/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 11/06/1936. | ||
04/12/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/12/1936. | ||
27/08/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 27/08/1937. | ||
17/06/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 17/06/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number C1739 (Diagram 97) |
||
01/07/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/07/1939. | ||
07/12/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 07/12/1940. | ||
26/02/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/02/1943. | ||
20/08/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy) - Arr: 20/08/1943. | ||
11/12/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/12/1943. | ||
07/04/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/04/1945. Dep: 05/05/1945. | ||
27/04/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy) - Arr: 27/04/1946. Dep: 28/05/1946. | ||
11/08/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4795 | ||
21/04/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 21/04/1947. Dep: 25/06/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2636 (Diagram 97) |
||
02/03/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/03/1948. Dep: 04/03/1948. | ||
13/10/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 13/10/1950. Dep: 04/11/1950. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 64795 |
||
02/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 02/03/1954. Dep: 27/03/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27546 (Diagram 97) |
||
05/03/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 05/03/1957. Dep: 06/04/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27543 (Diagram 97) |
||
04/11/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/11/1957. Dep: 06/11/1957. | ||
26/02/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/02/1959. | ||
10/03/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
25/06/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 25/06/1959. Dep: 30/06/1959. | ||
23/01/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 23/01/1961. Dep: 17/03/1961. Work undertaken: A.W.S. fitted |
||
22/01/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dunfermline Upper (62C) | ||
29/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64795 from Dunfermline Upper (62C) | ||
05/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |