|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 27/05/1931 | 04/07/1931 | 39 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 27/07/1934 | 16/08/1934 | 21 days | General | Boiler number 2282 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/02/1937 | 06/03/1937 | 18 days | General | Boiler number 8586 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/06/1937 | 18/06/1937 | 17 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 20/08/1939 | 04/11/1939 | 77 days | General | Boiler number 8012 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 28/01/1940 | 10/02/1940 | 14 days | Light Repair | |||
Stratford Works | 13/01/1943 | 15/05/1943 | 123 days | General | Boiler number 2688 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 10/08/1945 | 29/09/1945 | 51 days | General | Boiler number 8012 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/02/1949 | 02/04/1949 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 2106 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64777 |
||
Gorton Works | 18/04/1949 | 23/04/1949 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Derby Works | 13/10/1951 | 12/12/1951 | 61 days | General | Boiler number 27683 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 10/05/1953 | 20/06/1953 | 42 days | Light Casual | |||
Stratford Works | 22/10/1953 | 24/12/1953 | 64 days | Light Casual | |||
Stratford Works | 30/11/1954 | 15/01/1955 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 27674 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 13/10/1955 | 07/02/1956 | 118 days | Light Casual | |||
Stratford Works | 23/09/1957 | 19/10/1957 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 27890 (Diagram 97) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
15/04/1929 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2724 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1448 Allocated to York (North) (YK) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
20/04/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ipswich (IPS) | ||
30/05/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (PKS) | ||
27/05/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/05/1931. Dep: 04/07/1931. | ||
26/03/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colchester (COL) | ||
27/07/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/07/1934. Dep: 16/08/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2282 (Diagram 97) |
||
17/02/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/02/1937. Dep: 06/03/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8586 (Diagram 97) |
||
02/06/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/06/1937. Dep: 18/06/1937. | ||
20/08/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/08/1939. Dep: 04/11/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8012 (Diagram 97) |
||
03/12/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
28/01/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/01/1940. Dep: 10/02/1940. | ||
13/01/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 13/01/1943. Dep: 15/05/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2688 (Diagram 97) |
||
10/08/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 10/08/1945. Dep: 29/09/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8012 (Diagram 97) |
||
12/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4777 | ||
24/02/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/02/1949. Dep: 02/04/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2106 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64777 |
||
18/04/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/04/1949. Dep: 23/04/1949. | ||
18/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F) | ||
30/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F) | ||
13/10/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (General) - Arr: 13/10/1951. Dep: 12/12/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27683 (Diagram 97) |
||
10/05/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/05/1953. Dep: 20/06/1953. | ||
22/10/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/10/1953. Dep: 24/12/1953. | ||
30/11/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 30/11/1954. Dep: 15/01/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27674 (Diagram 97) |
||
13/10/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 13/10/1955. Dep: 07/02/1956. | ||
23/09/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 23/09/1957. Dep: 19/10/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27890 (Diagram 97) |
||
08/11/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
01/1960 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
04/01/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64777 from Stratford (30A) |