|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 18/06/1930 | 02/08/1930 | 46 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 16/01/1933 | 16/02/1933 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 2291 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/04/1935 | 13/04/1935 | 13 days | General | Boiler number 825 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/06/1937 | 03/07/1937 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 2210 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/05/1939 | 10/06/1939 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 2208 (Diagram 97) |
||
Doncaster Works | 10/09/1941 | 10/11/1941 | 62 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/10/1942 | 19/12/1942 | 70 days | Heavy | |||
Gorton Works | 04/06/1944 | 12/08/1944 | 70 days | General | Boiler number 2770 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/10/1945 | 24/11/1945 | 31 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 18/12/1945 | 16/02/1946 | 61 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 10/06/1947 | 10/11/1947 | 154 days | General | Boiler number 2112 (Diagram 97) |
||
Derby Works | 29/09/1950 | 20/11/1950 | 53 days | Heavy Intermediate | Renumbered to BR 64749 |
||
Derby Works | 10/11/1952 | 30/12/1952 | 51 days | General | Boiler number 27739 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/06/1955 | 13/08/1955 | 51 days | General | Boiler number 27843 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/09/1958 | 18/10/1958 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 25844 (Diagram 97) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/11/1950 | Derby Works | In addition to the normal types of L.M.S. origin, the following have come off works: 2060, 2107, 12011, 64749/82, 64807/34, 64958/9. Withdrawn engines in works yard: 3802, 20155, 22853, 58061. No. 20155 has had the number freshly painted on the smokebox door, and neatly enclosed in a white-painted rectangle. Buffer beam repainted, but boiler casing removed. Engines in for repair 2053 (82D), 12012 (8C), 12002 (5B), 64841 (32B), 64893 (36A), 64971 (40A), 64727 (9F), (6)4910 (36A), 64734 (40A), 64793 (32B), 64805 (39A), 42387/8 (87K); 7316 (71G); and the following other un-renumbered engines 7583 (26B), 2995 (18B), 524 (7B), 4294 (18A), 7131 (21A), 7298 (4A), 7300 (33A), 32 (14B); also numerous others of L.M.S. origin. Position as regards new construction on 30/11/50:-42062/3 almost complete; 42064/5 commenced; 12084/5 in paint shop, 12086 completed. Early in December another diesel, 12087 had the engines mounted, and the frames of 73000 were in the erecting shop. Among engines entering works were 509 (71G), 2988 (15B), 3827 (18A), 7503 (11C), 64802 (32A), 64979 (37A). Nos. 509, 43319 an 3827 were 'for special examination' and may not survive the ordeal. |
SLS/195101 |
10/03/1963 | Ardsley MPD (Stored) | Stored at Ardsley on 10th March-60036/69/70/7/80/92/125, 61068/310, 64719/49/54/6/60/96/859/79/86/911/8/69, 67742/63/5/6/77. | SLS/196304 |
01/04/1963 | Washingborough Junction (Stored) | The Washingborough Junc.- Pelham St. Junc, section of the Boston-Lincoln line has been taken out of use; trains now use the former avoiding line from Washingborough Junc. (s.b. now closed) to Greetwell Junc. and the GN/GE Joint line thence to Lincoln Central. | SLS/196304 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/08/1928 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2696 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1410 Allocated to Gorton (GOR) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
18/06/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/06/1930. Dep: 02/08/1930. | ||
02/09/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
16/01/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/01/1933. Dep: 16/02/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2291 (Diagram 97) |
||
01/04/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/04/1935. Dep: 13/04/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 825 (Diagram 97) |
||
29/02/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
07/06/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/06/1937. Dep: 03/07/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2210 (Diagram 97) |
||
15/05/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/05/1939. Dep: 10/06/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2208 (Diagram 97) |
||
10/09/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/09/1941. Dep: 10/11/1941. | ||
17/03/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
13/05/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
11/10/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 11/10/1942. Dep: 19/12/1942. | ||
04/06/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/06/1944. Dep: 12/08/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2770 (Diagram 97) |
||
25/10/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/10/1945. Dep: 24/11/1945. | ||
18/12/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/12/1945. Dep: 16/02/1946. | ||
18/08/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (BFD) | ||
15/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4749 | ||
10/06/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/06/1947. Dep: 10/11/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2112 (Diagram 97) |
||
16/11/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
30/11/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP) | ||
02/05/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
29/09/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 29/09/1950. Dep: 20/11/1950. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 64749 |
||
10/11/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (General) - Arr: 10/11/1952. Dep: 30/12/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27739 (Diagram 97) |
||
24/06/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/06/1955. Dep: 13/08/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27843 (Diagram 97) |
||
09/09/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/09/1958. Dep: 18/10/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 25844 (Diagram 97) |
||
12/11/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64749 from Ardsley (56B) | ||
09/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |