|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 15/06/1929 | 11/07/1929 | 27 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 25/09/1931 | 07/11/1931 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 2122 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/01/1934 | 24/02/1934 | 30 days | General | Not repaired - sent to Gorton Boiler number 2109 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/07/1936 | 08/08/1936 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 2218 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/07/1939 | 12/08/1939 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 2222 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 04/06/1942 | 29/08/1942 | 87 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 19/05/1945 | 07/07/1945 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 8015 (Diagram 97) Screw Reverse fitted |
||
Stratford Works | 07/12/1946 | 13/06/1947 | 189 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 20/09/1948 | 06/11/1948 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 4916 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64733 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 12/04/1951 | 02/05/1951 | 21 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 18/02/1953 | 08/03/1953 | 19 days | General | Boiler number 27491 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 01/08/1956 | 01/09/1956 | 32 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 20/03/1959 | 17/04/1959 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 27528 (Diagram 97) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/06/1927 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1277 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1368 Allocated to Immingham (IMM) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
15/06/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/06/1929. Dep: 11/07/1929. | ||
25/09/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/09/1931. Dep: 07/11/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2122 (Diagram 97) |
||
05/08/1932 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
09/09/1932 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
26/01/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/01/1934. Dep: 24/02/1934. Work undertaken: Not repaired - sent to Gorton Boiler number 2109 (Diagram 97) |
||
27/11/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) | ||
06/12/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET) | ||
14/04/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) | ||
16/07/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/07/1936. Dep: 08/08/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2218 (Diagram 97) |
||
01/09/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET) | ||
20/07/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/07/1939. Dep: 12/08/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2222 (Diagram 97) |
||
23/08/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
04/07/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
04/06/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 04/06/1942. Dep: 29/08/1942. | ||
19/05/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/05/1945. Dep: 07/07/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8015 (Diagram 97) Screw Reverse fitted |
||
19/01/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (PKS) | ||
06/04/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4733 | ||
08/06/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
07/12/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 07/12/1946. Dep: 13/06/1947. | ||
20/09/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/09/1948. Dep: 06/11/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4916 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64733 |
||
12/10/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
16/10/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD) | ||
22/05/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (9F) | ||
07/01/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carlisle Canal (12B) | ||
31/01/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carlisle Canal (12B) | ||
12/04/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 12/04/1951. Dep: 02/05/1951. | ||
18/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 18/02/1953. Dep: 08/03/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27491 (Diagram 97) |
||
01/08/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 01/08/1956. Dep: 01/09/1956. | ||
20/03/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 20/03/1959. Dep: 17/04/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27528 (Diagram 97) |
||
19/10/1961 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64733 from Carlisle Canal (12C) | ||
08/1962 | Scrapped | Scrapped |