Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 25 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17828 Week
» 70844 Month
» 190371 Year
» 3217224 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
1441 |
on |
15/04/1926 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5928 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
65928 |
m/e |
03/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
J38 |
Company History |
LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
1328 |
To Service |
Sat 15/04/1926 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 29/12/1962 |
Service Life |
36 yrs, 8 mths , 14 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 05/1963 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
on |
15/04/1926 |
DFU |
|
Dunfermline Upper |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
29/12/1962 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
on |
29/12/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
05/1945 |
Screw Reverse fitted |
05/1945 |
Steam Reverse Removed |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
12/06/1963 |
Inverurie Works (Scrapped) |
In Works: 42273, 45176, 61076, 61103, D8032. Shopped in four weeks ending 7th June : 64588, D362, D6155, 44960, 65930, 61404. Scrapped in same period: 64581, 65217/57/304, 64822, 65928; 64499, 65237. Being scrapped: 57617/31, 68346, 90077/575. Awaiting scrapping or shopping-64599/600, 64795, 64950/86. 64946 was waiting at Kittybrewster. |
SLS/196307 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
15/04/1926 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1441 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1328 |
|
|
05/1945 |
Modification |
Modification: Screw Reverse fitted |
|
|
05/1945 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam Reverse Removed |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5928 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Dunfermline Upper (DFU) |
|
|
03/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65928 |
|
|
29/12/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65928 |
|
|
05/1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|