Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 3639 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17045 Week
» 70061 Month
» 189588 Year
» 3216441 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
1420 |
on |
18/03/1926 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5917 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
65917 |
m/e |
05/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
J38 |
Company History |
LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
1317 |
To Service |
Sat 18/03/1926 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 19/11/1966 |
Service Life |
40 yrs, 8 mths , 1 dy |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
04/1946 |
Screw Reverse fitted |
04/1946 |
Steam Reverse Removed |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
18/03/1926 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1420 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1317 |
|
|
04/1946 |
Modification |
Modification: Screw Reverse fitted |
|
|
04/1946 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam Reverse Removed |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5917 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Dunfermline Upper (DFU) |
|
|
05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65917 |
|
|
21/05/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmont (POL) |
|
|
30/05/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Grangemouth (65F) |
|
|
22/08/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A) |
|
|
26/09/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dunfermline Upper (62C) |
|
|
19/11/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65917 |
|
|
04/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Arnott Young: Old Kilpatrick |
|
|