Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 987 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18790 Week
» 71806 Month
» 191333 Year
» 3218186 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
1406 |
on |
30/01/1926 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5905 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
65905 |
m/e |
06/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
J38 |
Company History |
LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
1305 |
To Service |
Wed 30/01/1926 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 25/05/1966 |
Service Life |
40 yrs, 3 mths , 25 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1966 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
62A |
Thornton Junction |
4w/e |
01/12/1956 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
25/05/1966 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
06/1948 |
Screw Reverse fitted |
06/1948 |
Steam Reverse Removed |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
18/04/1962 |
Inverurie Works (In shops) |
In shops-44322/28, 45009, 64572, 64606, 65905. Awaiting shops: 65479. Shopped in previous five weeks-64552/91, 64602/27, 65297. Cut up previous five weeks- 55165/229, 57559, 61996/8, 64542/53, 65296, 68338. Being cut up: 40645/7, 57411, 57557, 64628. Awaiting cut up: 57560, 64566, 64963. 64553 was involved in an accident which resulted in a large 'tear' along the frame and although there was a possibility of repair it was scrapped in the shops. The battery rail-car is back in shops after further trials. |
SLS/196205 |
14/10/1964 |
Inverurie Works (In shops) |
Shopped during the five weeks ending 9th October : 44718, 78054, D3558; In shops for minor repairs, modification, etc.: 44956, 45016, 46464, 64608, D264, D2416/23, D3902, D5116/21/27/30/32, D5214, D5300, D6116/36/42/48/52/55, D8094, D8554/71/76; in shops : 44925, 65905, D2414, D3549, D6117/19/38/51; Stored: 62712. |
SLS/196411 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
30/01/1926 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1406 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1305 |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5905 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Dunfermline Upper (DFU) |
|
|
06/1948 |
Modification |
Modification: Screw Reverse fitted |
|
|
06/1948 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam Reverse Removed |
|
|
06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65905 |
|
|
22/12/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A) |
|
|
25/05/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65905 |
|
|
10/1966 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|