Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 345 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18148 Week
» 71164 Month
» 190691 Year
» 3217544 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
2388 |
m/e |
07/1923 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5890 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
British Railways |
65890 |
m/e |
10/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell / V. Raven |
Class |
J27 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
1197 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 07/1923 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Mon 06/05/1963 |
Service Life |
39 yrs, 10 mths , 6 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 07/1963 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
YK |
York (North) |
w/e |
16/07/1949 |
ALLOC |
52FS |
|
4w/e |
08/09/1962 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
06/05/1963 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
by 06/1942 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
by 03/1948 |
LNER Diagram 57 Boiler Fitted |
by 10/1951 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/06/1951 |
Locomotives still not renumbered |
Although it is well over three years since the B.R. renumbering scheme was introduced, there were several classes with a small percentage still not renumbered (or at any rate not advised as done) at the end of June-Class B16 (69 survivors): Nos. 1419/23/33. Class D20 (28 survivors): Nos. 2360/72/95. Class Q5 (4 survivors): Nos. 3270, 3311/4/26. Of this large class, only 9 received B.R. numbers, the last to be done being 63313(2/12/48). None of the renumbered engines survives. Class Q6 is completely renumbered, No. 63342 having just been done. Class Q7 (15 engines): all done except. No. 3460. Class J21 (37 survivors): all done except 5025, 5117/22. Class J24 (6 survivors): not renumbered are 5623 (Scotland) and 5644. Class J25 (57 survivors): all done except 5663/7/86, 5727. (5699 has become 65699 but no trace of advice). Class J26 was completed on 19/5/51 when 65769 was done. Class J27 (115 engines): all done except 5890/4. Class G5 (106 survivors): all renumbered by 31/3/51. Class J71 (76 survivors): twelve to be done, Nos. 8230/1/9/47/9/51/4/72/98, 8304/11/6-an unusually large percentage not dealt with. Class J77 (38 survivors): Nos. 8405/38 not renumbered. Class J72 (113 engines): to be renumbered 8672/81, 8730(?), 8748. Class N10 (19 survivors): all done (?except 9095). |
SLS/195108 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1923 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2388 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1197 |
|
|
11/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) |
|
|
06/1942 |
Modification |
Modification: LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
|
|
06/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5890 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Selby (SEL) |
|
|
03/1948 |
Modification |
Modification: LNER Diagram 57 Boiler Fitted |
|
|
16/07/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (YK) |
|
|
10/1951 |
Modification |
Modification: LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
|
|
10/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65890 |
|
|
01/09/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blyth (North) (52F) |
|
|
06/05/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65890 |
|
|
07/1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|