Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 365 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18168 Week
» 71184 Month
» 190711 Year
» 3217564 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
1231 |
m/e |
08/1908 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5859 |
m/e |
03/1946 |
British Railways |
65859 |
m/e |
06/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell / V. Raven |
Class |
J27 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
5123 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 08/1908 |
Withdrawal |
Sun 04/09/1966 |
Service Life |
58 yrs, 1 mth , 4 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 12/1966 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
08/1908 |
WBY |
|
Whitby |
H |
12/1935 |
SEL |
|
Selby |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
50F |
|
Malton |
4w/e |
19/02/1955 |
50A |
|
York (North) |
w/e |
20/04/1963 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
04/09/1966 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
51L |
Thornaby |
4w/e |
21/03/1959 |
ALLOC |
51C |
West Hartlepool |
2w/e |
19/12/1964 |
ALLOC |
51A |
Darlington |
4w/e |
02/01/1965 |
ALLOC |
52FS |
|
4w/e |
23/04/1966 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
04/09/1966 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
by 06/1946 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
09/09/1963 |
Thornaby MPD (in store) |
The steam allocation here is now in store viz. 60859/946, 65859/84, 67635/40, 68023/39, 76024, 77001/11/4, 90072/81/406/46/51/593. From 9th September (when West Aukland closed) seven type 3 d/es now work all former West Aukland duties. |
SLS/196310 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1908 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1231 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 5123 |
|
|
12/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Whitby (WBY) |
|
|
03/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5859 |
|
|
06/1946 |
Modification |
Modification: LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Selby (SEL) |
|
|
06/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65859 |
|
|
19/02/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Malton (50F) |
|
|
20/04/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
04/09/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65859 |
|
|
12/1966 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|