|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/04/1949 | Darlington Works | New work April: Nos. 60146 an 60147. Locomotives awaiting Works during April included: Nos. 888, 1035, 61199, 1224, 1405, 61625, 1668, 2726, 62753. 2760, 3044, 3260, 3275, 63286, 5044/68, 5109, 65633/50, 5653, 65684, 5858, 65868, 7278, 7675, 67729 (light re-pair), 67739 (damaged), 8156, 69842, Class '8' W.D. 77037, 77178 an 79206. Broken up: Nos. 63286, 3316, 65633/84. Locomotives ex Works during April included: Nos. 60816, 61023, 61215/40/57, 61422, 61434 (rebuilt), 61648, 62700/03/64/67, 63348/80/92, 63411, 65110, 65739, 65821/44, 67722 (light repair), 68015/27, 68409/14/32, 68705, 69107, 69391, 69835/36/88, Class '8' W.D. 90382, 90449 (light repair) and 90460. |
SLS/194906 |
20/08/1954 | Scrapped NER engines | A number of N.E.R. engines have been cut up recently. They include D20 Nos. 62388, 62392; J77 Nos. 68422 an 68401 (this engine has round cab windows and vacuum ejector); G5 No. 67288; J7 No. 8256; A7 No. 69776 and J21 No. 65042/68/75. | SLS/195410 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/1890 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 300 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 133 |
||
04/1906 | Modification | Modification: Converted from Compound to Simple cylinders | ||
12/1916 | Modification | Modification: Fitted with 19" cylinders and Piston Valves | ||
12/1916 | Modification | Modification: Schmidt pattern superheater fitted | ||
12/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lowestoft (LOW) | ||
06/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 5068 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - York (North) (YK) | ||
20/11/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Selby (SEL) | ||
09/04/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
06/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 65068 | ||
21/06/1954 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 65068 from Darlington (51A) | ||
07/1954 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |