Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2533 Today
» 5153 Yesterday
» 7686 Week
» 142502 Month
» 345166 Year
» 3372019 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway (1st) |
937 |
m/e |
08/1892 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7937 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5422 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
British Railways |
65422 |
m/e |
08/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Worsdell |
Class |
J15 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
X28 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 08/1892 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 04/07/1955 |
Service Life |
62 yrs, 11 mths , 3 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 07/1955 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
32B |
Ipswich |
m/e |
31/03/1951 |
ALLOC |
31B |
March |
4w/e |
06/09/1952 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
04/07/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1892 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 937 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7937 |
|
|
12/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5422 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Norwich Thorpe (NOR) |
|
|
08/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65422 |
|
|
24/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
31/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
23/08/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
06/09/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
07/1955 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
04/07/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65422 |
|
|