Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 589 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 14632 Week
» 79586 Month
» 282250 Year
» 3309103 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Central Railway |
203 |
m/e |
10/1903 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5203 |
m/e |
05/1926 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4331 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
64331 |
m/e |
10/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Robinson |
Class |
J11 |
Company History |
GCR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
4523 |
To Service |
During 10/1903 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 30/01/1960 |
Service Life |
56 yrs , 4 mths |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
05/1926 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
27/12/1958 |
Rugby Works |
42451(26A), 73137(15C), 75052(1E), 90576 (26A), 61853(2F), 64331(2F). |
SLS/195902 |
21/02/1959 |
Woodford Halse MPD |
On 21st February J11s 64331/418/28 were exchanged for MR 3Fs 43330/89/94 and these are employed on 'trip' work. |
SLS/195904 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1903 |
To Service |
To service as Great Central Railway Number 203 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 4523 |
|
|
05/1926 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated boiler fitted |
|
|
05/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5203 |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4331 |
|
|
10/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64331 |
|
|
06/09/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E) |
|
|
20/09/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E) |
|
|
14/02/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gorton (9G) |
|
|
30/01/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64331 |
|
|