Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 321 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18124 Week
» 71140 Month
» 190667 Year
» 3217520 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Central Railway |
849 |
|
05/1897 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5849 |
|
05/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5169 |
|
04/1946 |
British Railways |
65169 |
|
09/10/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Parker |
Class |
J10 |
Company History |
MLSR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
3767 |
To Service |
During 05/1897 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 13/02/1960 |
Service Life |
62 yrs, 9 mths , 14 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
05/1897 |
TFD |
|
Trafford Park (LNER) |
w/e |
23/10/1948 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
13/02/1960 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
TFD |
Trafford Park (LNER) |
w/e |
23/10/1948 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
13/02/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
12/09/1953 |
Northwich MPD |
The following Class J.10 0-6-0's were on the shed at 10 p.m., 65134, 65139, 65165, 65156, 65158, 65169 an 65202. Class D.10 4-4-0, 62659 Worsley Taylor, was at the end of No. 3 road, inside the shed minus her tender, with D.11, 62669 Ypres, on the adjoining road. Only one 'Super-D' (49435) was present. The balance of the inhabitants was made up of '8F's', a few Class 4 0-6-0's, a '3F' 0-6-0 and one N.5 0-6-2T, Number 69255. No O.4's were in evidence. Ex.G.C. 2-6-4 tank 69052 has returned to Northwich shed as from 20/9, having had a reprieve from scrapping. From 21/9, the whole of the working of limestone traffic between Tunstead and Northwich has been entrusted to Northwich shed, instead of being shared with Heaton Mersey. This will result in the saving of seven sets of men and nearly 1,500 miles of 'light engine' running annually. Three additional 8F's have been allocated to 9E for the new rosters. |
SLS/195311 |
31/01/1955 |
Northwich MPD |
Once quite a 'J10 stronghold', this shed, in January, 1955, has only four examples on its strength: 65131, 65134, 65165 an 65169. Their duties are confined to shunting and trips on the Winsford branch. Three 'super Ds' now deal with the Winnington branch traffic and the last ex-GC 2-6-4 tank has gone. It was a much-photographed locomotive, the running shed foreman relating how, what he rather delightfully styled a 'number snatcher', had come all the way from Scotland to secure a picture! There has been a resurgence of Sunday 'hoppers' between Northwich and Tunstead, no less than five trips being run on 9/1/55. The two diesel shunters allocated to Northwich last year continue to give satisfaction. They run down to Crewe once per fortnight for re-fuelling and servicing. A somewhat rare visitor to Northwich when on 8/1/55 was 2-6-4T 42566 of 5A. The only other ex-L.N.E. locomotive present on 8/1/55 was D10 4-4-0 62656 'Sir. Clement Royds'. |
SLS/195503 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1897 |
To Service |
To service as Great Central Railway Number 849 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 3767 |
|
|
05/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5849 |
|
|
04/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5169 |
|
|
09/10/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65169 |
|
|
23/10/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD) |
|
|
13/02/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65169 |
|
|