Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 3631 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17037 Week
» 70053 Month
» 189580 Year
» 3216433 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
569 |
m/e |
09/1913 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
3569 |
m/e |
08/1926 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4218 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
64218 |
m/e |
09/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt / N. Gresley |
Class |
J6 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
275 |
Works Number |
1404 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 09/1913 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 18/09/1958 |
Service Life |
45 yrs , 18 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1958 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
01/1941 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1913 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 569 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1404 |
|
|
08/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3569 |
|
|
01/1941 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4218 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Doncaster (DON) |
|
|
09/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64218 |
|
|
21/11/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (38A) |
|
|
14/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E) |
|
|
19/07/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (40E) |
|
|
18/09/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64218 |
|
|
10/1958 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|