Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 795 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14201 Week
» 67217 Month
» 186744 Year
» 3213597 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
548 |
m/e |
05/1913 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
3548 |
m/e |
08/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4197 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
British Railways |
64197 |
m/e |
06/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt / N. Gresley |
Class |
J6 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
273 |
Works Number |
1383 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 05/1913 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 13/10/1959 |
Service Life |
46 yrs, 5 mths , 13 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 12/1959 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
34D |
Hitchin (GNR) |
4w/e |
29/11/1952 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
13/10/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
12/1940 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1913 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 548 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1383 |
|
|
08/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3548 |
|
|
12/1940 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
|
|
07/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4197 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Colwick (CLK) |
|
|
06/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64197 |
|
|
15/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hitchin (GNR) (34D) |
|
|
29/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hitchin (GNR) (34D) |
|
|
13/10/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64197 |
|
|
12/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|