Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 4086 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17492 Week
» 70508 Month
» 190035 Year
» 3216888 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
538 |
m/e |
11/1912 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
3538 |
m/e |
02/1926 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4187 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
64187 |
m/e |
10/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt / N. Gresley |
Class |
J6 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
271 |
Works Number |
1364 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 11/1912 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 02/01/1958 |
Service Life |
45 yrs, 2 mths , 2 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1958 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
11/1912 |
NWE |
|
New England |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
35B |
|
Grantham |
on |
29/10/1950 |
35B |
|
Grantham |
4w/e |
25/11/1950 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
02/01/1958 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
35B |
Grantham |
on |
29/10/1950 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
02/01/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
06/1939 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1912 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 538 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1364 |
|
|
02/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3538 |
|
|
06/1939 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4187 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - New England (NWE) |
|
|
10/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64187 |
|
|
29/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Grantham (35B) |
|
|
25/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Grantham (35B) |
|
|
02/01/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64187 |
|
|
02/1958 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|