Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 4379 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17785 Week
» 70801 Month
» 190328 Year
» 3217181 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
531 |
m/e |
11/1911 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
3531 |
m/e |
04/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4180 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
British Railways |
64180 |
m/e |
01/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt / N. Gresley |
Class |
J6 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
266 |
Works Number |
1321 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 11/1911 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 03/03/1960 |
Service Life |
48 yrs, 4 mths , 1 dy |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 04/1960 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
11/1911 |
BOS |
|
Boston |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
34E |
|
New England |
w/e |
26/09/1959 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
03/03/1960 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
34E |
New England |
4w/e |
03/10/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
03/03/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
10/1940 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1911 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 531 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1321 |
|
|
04/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3531 |
|
|
10/1940 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
|
|
12/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4180 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Boston (BOS) |
|
|
01/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64180 |
|
|
26/09/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (34E) |
|
|
03/03/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64180 |
|
|
04/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|