|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gateshead Works | 01/06/1923 | 03/08/1923 | 64 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 11/09/1923 | 21/09/1923 | 11 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 05/01/1925 | 04/03/1925 | 59 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 30/12/1926 | 22/04/1927 | 114 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 05/05/1927 | 11/06/1927 | 38 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 30/10/1928 | 21/12/1928 | 53 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 15/11/1929 | 19/11/1929 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Gateshead Works | 02/07/1930 | 20/08/1930 | 50 days | General | Boiler number D1202 (Diagram 63) |
||
Gateshead Works | 22/01/1932 | 26/02/1932 | 36 days | General | Boiler number D1313 (Diagram 63) |
||
Darlington Works | 16/02/1934 | 14/05/1934 | 88 days | Rebuilding | Boiler number D1107 (Diagram 63) |
||
Darlington Works | 12/05/1936 | 04/09/1936 | 116 days | General | Boiler number D1251 (Diagram 63) |
||
Darlington Works | 25/04/1939 | 1 day | Weighing | ||||
Darlington Works | 04/12/1939 | 16/01/1940 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 2455 (Diagram 63A) |
||
Darlington Works | 10/12/1940 | 09/01/1941 | 31 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 15/04/1942 | 1 day | Weighing | ||||
Darlington Works | 05/10/1943 | 04/11/1943 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 2463 (Diagram 63A) |
||
Gateshead Works | 30/11/1944 | 20/12/1944 | 21 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 26/03/1945 | 17/04/1945 | 23 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 21/06/1946 | 20/07/1946 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 116 (Diagram 63A) |
||
Darlington Works | 02/07/1947 | 06/09/1947 | 67 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 29/09/1948 | 22/10/1948 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 2375 (Diagram 63) Renumbered to BR 69891 |
||
Darlington Works | 27/06/1950 | 05/08/1950 | 40 days | General | Positive lub. drive fitted Boiler number 2455 (Diagram 63A) |
||
Darlington Works | 08/08/1950 | 10/08/1950 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 28/05/1952 | 21/06/1952 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 24733 (Diagram 63C) |
||
Darlington Works | 23/06/1952 | 24/06/1952 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 21/10/1952 | 05/11/1952 | 16 days | Light Casual | After collision |
||
Darlington Works | 08/07/1953 | 15/07/1953 | 8 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 18/09/1953 | 30/10/1953 | 43 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 28/06/1954 | 24/07/1954 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 24769 (Diagram 63B) |
||
Darlington Works | 24/06/1957 | 08/07/1957 | 15 days | Light Casual | After collision |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
01/11/1948 | Darlington Works | The new Class 'A.1' locomotives, Nos. 60130-33, ex North Road bear Works Nos. 2049-52, in order. A minor change will be noticed in the new Darlington and Doncaster Works plates on the new 'A.1's,' they give the date, Works No. and origin, but no area is given. No. 68051 has been fitted with a modified bunker (and new cab windows), for increased coal capacity. Locomotives awaiting Works:-Nos. 827, 1601/29/30/42/51/55/72, 2992 (to scrap yard), 3007, 3344, 4916, 5710, 7307, 8089, 8400, 8686, 9099, 9392, 69841, 'Austerity' 77329 and Electric 26500. Locomotives ex Works:-Nos. 60507, 60980. 62366, 62711/23/75, 63398, 65028, 65118, 65752/85, 65803/83, 67256/65, 68051, 68395, 68437, 68533, 68675, 69372/92, 69787, 69882/91/93 and- 'Austerity' 77215. Locomotives broken up:-Nos. 1360/78, 5641, 8285, 8400 an 9399. It will be noticed that two of these were ex G.C.R. 'B.7' 4-6-0's. It is pleasing to note that the N.E. Area locomotives. especially Gateshead stock, are approaching their pre-grouping splendour for cleanliness. Some of the 'A.4's' are spotless, while the rest are creditable. |
SLS/194812 |
02/12/1948 | Darlington Works | Further new Class 'A.1' locomotives, Nos. 60134-37, ex North Road bear Works, Nos. 2053-56, in order. Locomotives awaiting Works: Nos. 970, 1642/44/72, 2344/65/90, 2715, E2718, 3292, E3311, E3314, 3399, 3420, 5100, 5856, 7283, 7636/69, 8015, 8275, 8313, 8698, 8745, 9792, 9842/89, 60942, 62737/64, 63290, 67672, 67719/23 (both light repairs), 69784. The following were sent to the scrap yard:-Nos. 3253/92/95, 3323/27, 8090 an 9103. Locomotives ex Works: Nos. 60507 (unlined black, new chimney), 61019, 61627/38, 62371/91, 62708/47, 63140, 63344/58, 65706/17, 65803/14/32/52/83/89, 67300, 67311 (auto fitted), 67312, 67688, 68014 (altered bunker), 68245/95, 68426, 68678 (vacuum ejector), 68699, 69776, 69841/81/91, 69862 (first 'A.8' to be lined out), 69881/91, 'Austerity' 77050, 77195/99, 77329. |
SLS/194901 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/1922 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1328 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Blaydon (BLA) Diagram 63 boiler fitted |
||
01/06/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 01/06/1923. Dep: 03/08/1923. | ||
11/09/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/09/1923. Dep: 21/09/1923. | ||
05/01/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 05/01/1925. Dep: 04/03/1925. | ||
21/07/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
30/12/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 30/12/1926. Dep: 22/04/1927. | ||
05/05/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/05/1927. Dep: 11/06/1927. | ||
30/10/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 30/10/1928. Dep: 21/12/1928. | ||
15/11/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/11/1929. Dep: 19/11/1929. | ||
02/07/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 02/07/1930. Dep: 20/08/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1202 (Diagram 63) |
||
22/01/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 22/01/1932. Dep: 26/02/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1313 (Diagram 63) |
||
16/02/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Rebuilding) - Arr: 16/02/1934. Dep: 14/05/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1107 (Diagram 63) |
||
29/05/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stockton (SKN) | ||
12/05/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/05/1936. Dep: 04/09/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1251 (Diagram 63) |
||
25/04/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 25/04/1939. | ||
04/12/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/12/1939. Dep: 16/01/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2455 (Diagram 63A) |
||
10/12/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/12/1940. Dep: 09/01/1941. | ||
15/04/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 15/04/1942. | ||
25/08/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL) | ||
05/10/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/10/1943. Dep: 04/11/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2463 (Diagram 63A) |
||
30/11/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/11/1944. Dep: 20/12/1944. | ||
26/03/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/03/1945. Dep: 17/04/1945. | ||
31/03/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9891 | ||
21/06/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/06/1946. Dep: 20/07/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 116 (Diagram 63A) |
||
06/10/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Saltburn (SALT) | ||
02/07/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/07/1947. Dep: 06/09/1947. | ||
29/09/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/09/1948. Dep: 22/10/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2375 (Diagram 63) Renumbered to BR 69891 |
||
27/06/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/06/1950. Dep: 05/08/1950. Work undertaken: Positive lub. drive fitted Boiler number 2455 (Diagram 63A) |
||
08/08/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/08/1950. Dep: 10/08/1950. | ||
28/05/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/05/1952. Dep: 21/06/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24733 (Diagram 63C) |
||
23/06/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/06/1952. Dep: 24/06/1952. | ||
21/10/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/10/1952. Dep: 05/11/1952. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
08/07/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/07/1953. Dep: 15/07/1953. | ||
18/09/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 18/09/1953. Dep: 30/10/1953. | ||
28/06/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/06/1954. Dep: 24/07/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24769 (Diagram 63B) |
||
19/09/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (51D) | ||
24/06/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 24/06/1957. Dep: 08/07/1957. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
01/06/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) | ||
16/09/1958 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69891 from Thornaby (51L) |