|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gateshead Works | 30/07/1923 | 28/09/1923 | 61 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 18/02/1925 | 09/04/1925 | 51 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 17/11/1926 | 07/03/1927 | 111 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 24/08/1928 | 01/11/1928 | 70 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 14/03/1929 | 27/03/1929 | 14 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 08/04/1929 | 17/04/1929 | 10 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 18/07/1930 | 04/09/1930 | 49 days | General | Boiler number D1251 (Diagram 63) |
||
Gateshead Works | 14/03/1932 | 21/04/1932 | 39 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 31/01/1934 | 05/05/1934 | 95 days | Rebuilding | |||
Darlington Works | 20/05/1936 | 11/07/1936 | 53 days | General | Boiler number D1107 (Diagram 63) |
||
Darlington Works | 07/11/1938 | 22/12/1938 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 2664 (Diagram 63A) |
||
Darlington Works | 12/01/1939 | 24/01/1939 | 13 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 28/06/1940 | 13/07/1940 | 16 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 07/11/1940 | 17/12/1940 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 2661 (Diagram 63A) |
||
Darlington Works | 02/07/1942 | 07/07/1942 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 28/12/1942 | 05/02/1943 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 3036 (Diagram 63B) |
||
Darlington Works | 26/07/1944 | 02/09/1944 | 39 days | Heavy | |||
Darlington Works | 04/12/1944 | 1 day | Weighing | ||||
Darlington Works | 06/03/1945 | 1 day | Weighing | ||||
Darlington Works | 01/10/1945 | 1 day | Weighing | ||||
Darlington Works | 27/10/1945 | 24/11/1945 | 29 days | Light Repair | After collision |
||
Darlington Works | 11/02/1946 | 1 day | Weighing | ||||
Darlington Works | 25/09/1946 | 07/11/1946 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 2827 (Diagram 63C) |
||
Darlington Works | 15/11/1946 | 30/11/1946 | 16 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 12/11/1947 | 21/11/1947 | 10 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 01/12/1948 | 03/01/1949 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 3040 (Diagram 63B) Renumbered to BR 69876 |
||
Darlington Works | 11/07/1949 | 18/08/1949 | 39 days | Heavy | |||
Darlington Works | 23/02/1950 | 04/03/1950 | 10 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 06/02/1951 | 10/03/1951 | 33 days | General | Positive lub. drive fitted Boiler number 24756 (Diagram 63B) |
||
Darlington Works | 21/05/1951 | 1 day | Weighing | ||||
Darlington Works | 03/07/1951 | 1 day | Weighing | ||||
Darlington Works | 08/01/1952 | 1 day | Weighing | ||||
Darlington Works | 11/03/1952 | 1 day | Weighing | ||||
Darlington Works | 05/05/1952 | 1 day | Weighing | ||||
Darlington Works | 26/08/1952 | 1 day | Weighing | ||||
Darlington Works | 08/10/1952 | 18/10/1952 | 11 days | Light Casual | After collision |
||
Darlington Works | 05/11/1952 | 1 day | Weighing | ||||
Darlington Works | 03/02/1953 | 1 day | Weighing | ||||
Darlington Works | 12/05/1953 | 1 day | Weighing | ||||
Darlington Works | 19/08/1953 | 18/09/1953 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 24744 (Diagram 63B) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/11/1953 | 1 day | Weighing | ||||
Darlington Works | 17/09/1957 | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1920 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1529 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Heaton (HTN) Diagram 63 boiler fitted |
||
30/07/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 30/07/1923. Dep: 28/09/1923. | ||
18/02/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 18/02/1925. Dep: 09/04/1925. | ||
17/11/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 17/11/1926. Dep: 07/03/1927. | ||
24/08/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 24/08/1928. Dep: 01/11/1928. | ||
14/03/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/03/1929. Dep: 27/03/1929. | ||
08/04/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/04/1929. Dep: 17/04/1929. | ||
18/07/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 18/07/1930. Dep: 04/09/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1251 (Diagram 63) |
||
14/03/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 14/03/1932. Dep: 21/04/1932. | ||
31/01/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Rebuilding) - Arr: 31/01/1934. Dep: 05/05/1934. | ||
29/05/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Scarborough (SCA) | ||
16/10/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Starbeck (SBK) | ||
30/09/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
12/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
20/05/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/05/1936. Dep: 11/07/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1107 (Diagram 63) |
||
07/11/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/11/1938. Dep: 22/12/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2664 (Diagram 63A) |
||
12/01/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/01/1939. Dep: 24/01/1939. | ||
10/04/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Saltburn (SALT) | ||
28/06/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/06/1940. Dep: 13/07/1940. | ||
07/11/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/11/1940. Dep: 17/12/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2661 (Diagram 63A) |
||
02/07/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/07/1942. Dep: 07/07/1942. | ||
28/12/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/12/1942. Dep: 05/02/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3036 (Diagram 63B) |
||
26/07/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 26/07/1944. Dep: 02/09/1944. | ||
04/12/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 04/12/1944. | ||
06/03/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 06/03/1945. | ||
01/10/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 01/10/1945. | ||
27/10/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/10/1945. Dep: 24/11/1945. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
11/02/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 11/02/1946. | ||
14/07/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9876 | ||
25/09/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/09/1946. Dep: 07/11/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2827 (Diagram 63C) |
||
15/11/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/11/1946. Dep: 30/11/1946. | ||
12/11/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/11/1947. Dep: 21/11/1947. | ||
01/12/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/12/1948. Dep: 03/01/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3040 (Diagram 63B) Renumbered to BR 69876 |
||
11/07/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 11/07/1949. Dep: 18/08/1949. | ||
23/02/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 23/02/1950. Dep: 04/03/1950. | ||
11/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (53B) | ||
30/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (53B) | ||
19/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (51D) | ||
30/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (51D) | ||
06/02/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/02/1951. Dep: 10/03/1951. Work undertaken: Positive lub. drive fitted Boiler number 24756 (Diagram 63B) |
||
21/05/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 21/05/1951. | ||
03/07/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 03/07/1951. | ||
08/01/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 08/01/1952. | ||
11/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 11/03/1952. | ||
05/05/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 05/05/1952. | ||
26/08/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 26/08/1952. | ||
08/10/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/10/1952. Dep: 18/10/1952. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
05/11/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 05/11/1952. | ||
03/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 03/02/1953. | ||
12/05/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 12/05/1953. | ||
19/08/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/08/1953. Dep: 18/09/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24744 (Diagram 63B) |
||
11/11/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 11/11/1953. | ||
17/09/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 17/09/1957. | ||
21/10/1957 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69876 from Middlesbrough (51D) | ||
11/1957 | Scrapped | Scrapped |