|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gateshead Works | 15/11/1923 | 01/02/1924 | 79 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 03/07/1925 | 21/09/1925 | 81 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 21/10/1925 | 03/11/1925 | 14 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 07/03/1927 | 16/06/1927 | 102 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 13/01/1929 | 28/03/1929 | 75 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 12/03/1931 | 27/04/1931 | 47 days | General | Boiler number D289 (Diagram 63) |
||
Darlington Works | 07/03/1933 | 26/04/1933 | 51 days | General | Boiler number 2456 (Diagram 63A) |
||
Darlington Works | 04/02/1935 | 25/04/1935 | 81 days | Rebuilding | |||
Darlington Works | 15/02/1939 | 19/05/1939 | 94 days | General | Boiler number 2457 (Diagram 63A) |
||
Darlington Works | 14/06/1939 | 17/07/1939 | 34 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 20/10/1942 | 09/11/1942 | 21 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 20/09/1943 | 21/10/1943 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 2458 (Diagram 63A) |
||
Darlington Works | 28/11/1945 | 12/01/1946 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 114 (Diagram 63A) |
||
Darlington Works | 12/11/1947 | 12/12/1947 | 31 days | General | Boiler number D1251 (Diagram 63) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/01/1948 | 20/01/1948 | 12 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 12/07/1950 | 25/08/1950 | 45 days | General | Positive lub. drive fitted Boiler number 2824 (Diagram 63C) Renumbered to BR 69874 |
||
Darlington Works | 03/11/1952 | 28/11/1952 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 24735 (Diagram 63B) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/03/1955 | 02/04/1955 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 24732 (Diagram 63B) |
||
Darlington Works | 04/04/1955 | 07/04/1955 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 12/09/1957 | 18/10/1957 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 24711 (Diagram 63B) |
||
Darlington Works | 12/11/1957 | 18/11/1957 | 7 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/05/1959 | Class A8 4-6-2T (Sunderland) | All the locomotives of this class were noted stored during May viz.-Borough Gardens 69852/6/8/70, Darlington 69887, Saltburn 69869, Selby 69861, Sunderland 69850/3/4/5/7/9/73/4/5/8/83, Thornaby 69860, West Hartlepool 69867/77/85, York 69886. | SLS/195907 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1920 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1523 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Heaton (HTN) Diagram 63 boiler fitted |
||
15/11/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 15/11/1923. Dep: 01/02/1924. | ||
03/07/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 03/07/1925. Dep: 21/09/1925. | ||
21/10/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/10/1925. Dep: 03/11/1925. | ||
07/03/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 07/03/1927. Dep: 16/06/1927. | ||
27/06/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) | ||
13/01/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 13/01/1929. Dep: 28/03/1929. | ||
12/03/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 12/03/1931. Dep: 27/04/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number D289 (Diagram 63) |
||
07/03/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/03/1933. Dep: 26/04/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2456 (Diagram 63A) |
||
12/07/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
04/02/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Rebuilding) - Arr: 04/02/1935. Dep: 25/04/1935. | ||
22/05/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Whitby (WBY) | ||
15/02/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/02/1939. Dep: 19/05/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2457 (Diagram 63A) |
||
14/06/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/06/1939. Dep: 17/07/1939. | ||
26/02/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Starbeck (SBK) | ||
20/10/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/10/1942. Dep: 09/11/1942. | ||
28/06/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sunderland (SUN) | ||
20/09/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/09/1943. Dep: 21/10/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2458 (Diagram 63A) |
||
28/11/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/11/1945. Dep: 12/01/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 114 (Diagram 63A) |
||
07/07/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9874 | ||
12/11/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/11/1947. Dep: 12/12/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1251 (Diagram 63) |
||
09/01/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/01/1948. Dep: 20/01/1948. | ||
12/07/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/07/1950. Dep: 25/08/1950. Work undertaken: Positive lub. drive fitted Boiler number 2824 (Diagram 63C) Renumbered to BR 69874 |
||
03/11/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/11/1952. Dep: 28/11/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24735 (Diagram 63B) |
||
09/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/03/1955. Dep: 02/04/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24732 (Diagram 63B) |
||
04/04/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/04/1955. Dep: 07/04/1955. | ||
12/09/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/09/1957. Dep: 18/10/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24711 (Diagram 63B) |
||
12/11/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/11/1957. Dep: 18/11/1957. | ||
20/05/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69874 from Sunderland (52G) | ||
06/1960 | Scrapped | Scrapped |