|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gateshead Works | 07/07/1922 | 29/12/1922 | 176 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 25/01/1923 | 07/03/1923 | 42 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 28/04/1925 | 17/08/1925 | 112 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 22/03/1926 | 20/04/1926 | 30 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 12/12/1927 | 07/03/1928 | 87 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 08/08/1929 | 22/08/1929 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 22/07/1930 | 17/09/1930 | 58 days | General | Boiler number D1102 (Diagram 63) |
||
Gateshead Works | 24/10/1930 | 04/11/1930 | 12 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 02/11/1932 | 03/01/1933 | 63 days | General | Boiler number D1063 (Diagram 63) |
||
Darlington Works | 12/03/1935 | 27/06/1935 | 108 days | Rebuilding | Boiler number D1267 (Diagram 63) |
||
Darlington Works | 07/06/1937 | 26/07/1937 | 50 days | General | Boiler number D1219 (Diagram 63) |
||
Darlington Works | 16/10/1937 | 1 day | Weighing | ||||
Darlington Works | 15/04/1941 | 28/05/1941 | 44 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 09/07/1941 | 19/07/1941 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 02/07/1942 | 18/08/1942 | 48 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 24/08/1942 | 02/09/1942 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 04/08/1944 | 09/09/1944 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 2374 (Diagram 63) |
||
Darlington Works | 21/10/1946 | 18/01/1947 | 90 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 9864 |
||
Gateshead Works | 29/06/1948 | 13/07/1948 | 15 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 69864 |
||
Darlington Works | 08/06/1949 | 12/07/1949 | 35 days | General | Positive lub. drive fitted Boiler number 24712 (Diagram 63A) |
||
Darlington Works | 02/02/1950 | 10/03/1950 | 37 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 16/04/1951 | 12/05/1951 | 27 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 16/10/1951 | 10/11/1951 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 24721 (Diagram 63A) |
||
Darlington Works | 12/11/1951 | 13/11/1951 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 19/11/1951 | 23/11/1951 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 25/03/1954 | 24/04/1954 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 24723 (Diagram 63B) |
||
Darlington Works | 26/04/1954 | 30/04/1954 | 5 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/01/1956 | York MPD (ex-L.M.S.. shed) | December, 1955-January, 1956. On 28/12/55 60152 (64B), ex-works, was in York shed yard, and 60161 (64B) in similar circumstances on 5/1/56. 67764 (53B) was also at York on 28/12/55 en route for Darlington Works, whilst 67724 (30A) which had called at York, in rather poor condition, on 9/11/55, returned southward bound from Darlington Works on 12/1/56 in a more attractive state. On 29/12/55 new B.R. Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73106 from Doncaster was at York, with 76024 (52C) passing through for Doncaster Works. On the following day a very smart 60919 (61B) worked an up goods into Dringhouses during the course of running-in. from Darlington. On 4/1/56 44592 (5B) was an unusual visitor to York, whilst 63760 (54B) put in an appearance while on route for overhaul at Gorton. On the same day three very rusty and forlorn 'Sl' 0-8-4Ts were at York en route for scrapping at Darlington, namely 69900 (36A), 69902 (36B), 69904 (36B). 69900/04 were hauled in by 61188 (38A) in particularly smart trim. 69902 was still at York on the following day which was also marked by the unusual simultaneous appearance in York station of two 'B17s', 61626 (31A) and 61656 (32A); the former brought in the 7.20 a.m. Colchester to Newcastle train which has also recently produced Woodford V2s 60890 an 60915 instead of the more-usual Doncaster or March engine. On 12/1/56 unusual visitors were 43088 (35A), and from the L.M.R. 44692 (24A) and 45211 (25G). The beginning of the year saw the number of 'J25s' in store at York south shed reduced to two, i.e., 65675 an 65677, but the ex-L.M.S.. shed still contains 69864 (50G), 62702 (50A), 62746 (50D) and 62761 (50D) in store. 62730 (50A) is still dumped out of service in the north shed yard but 62345 is at last showing signs of awakening from her-very prolonged hibernation. |
SLS/195605 |
31/10/1957 | Whitby MPD | In store are 62731/5/55/9/62/4/70/2/5 an 69864/5/81. | SLS/195711 |
04/05/1959 | Darlington area | The withdrawn engines at Fighting Cocks and on the Barnard Castle branch were still there on 4th May, except that the Broomielaw ones were observed in the scrap yard at Darlington. North Road station contained 62754, 69810/34/42/63/4. Sentinel 68150 (50C) arrived for scrap 6th May (last in Capital stock). | SLS/195907 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/1914 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2157 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Heaton (HTN) Diagram 63 boiler fitted |
||
07/07/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 07/07/1922. Dep: 29/12/1922. | ||
25/01/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/01/1923. Dep: 07/03/1923. | ||
28/04/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 28/04/1925. Dep: 17/08/1925. | ||
22/03/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/03/1926. Dep: 20/04/1926. | ||
12/12/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 12/12/1927. Dep: 07/03/1928. | ||
08/08/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/08/1929. Dep: 22/08/1929. | ||
21/08/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD) | ||
22/07/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 22/07/1930. Dep: 17/09/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1102 (Diagram 63) |
||
24/10/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/10/1930. Dep: 04/11/1930. | ||
02/11/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/11/1932. Dep: 03/01/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1063 (Diagram 63) |
||
12/03/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Rebuilding) - Arr: 12/03/1935. Dep: 27/06/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1267 (Diagram 63) |
||
27/06/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stockton (SKN) | ||
07/06/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/06/1937. Dep: 26/07/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1219 (Diagram 63) |
||
16/10/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 16/10/1937. | ||
15/04/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/04/1941. Dep: 28/05/1941. | ||
09/07/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/07/1941. Dep: 19/07/1941. | ||
28/02/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL) | ||
02/07/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/07/1942. Dep: 18/08/1942. | ||
24/08/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/08/1942. Dep: 02/09/1942. | ||
04/08/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/08/1944. Dep: 09/09/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2374 (Diagram 63) |
||
21/10/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/10/1946. Dep: 18/01/1947. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 9864 |
||
29/06/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/06/1948. Dep: 13/07/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 69864 |
||
08/06/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/06/1949. Dep: 12/07/1949. Work undertaken: Positive lub. drive fitted Boiler number 24712 (Diagram 63A) |
||
02/02/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 02/02/1950. Dep: 10/03/1950. | ||
04/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Whitby (50G) | ||
30/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Whitby (50G) | ||
16/04/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/04/1951. Dep: 12/05/1951. | ||
16/10/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/10/1951. Dep: 10/11/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24721 (Diagram 63A) |
||
12/11/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/11/1951. Dep: 13/11/1951. | ||
19/11/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/11/1951. Dep: 23/11/1951. | ||
25/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/03/1954. Dep: 24/04/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24723 (Diagram 63B) |
||
26/04/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/04/1954. Dep: 30/04/1954. | ||
29/10/1958 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69864 from Whitby (50G) | ||
02/1959 | Scrapped | Scrapped |