|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 1922 | 05/1922 | General | ||||
Darlington Works | 11/01/1924 | 26/03/1924 | 76 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 26/01/1926 | 18/06/1926 | 144 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 14/10/1927 | 23/01/1928 | 102 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 08/11/1929 | 13/01/1930 | 67 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 22/03/1932 | 29/04/1932 | 39 days | General | Boiler number D1282 (Diagram 63) |
||
Darlington Works | 16/01/1935 | 26/03/1935 | 70 days | Rebuilding | |||
Darlington Works | 17/08/1937 | 01/10/1937 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 2373 (Diagram 63) |
||
Darlington Works | 06/06/1939 | 20/07/1939 | 45 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 29/11/1940 | 21/01/1941 | 54 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 22/07/1941 | 02/09/1941 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 2375 (Diagram 63) |
||
Darlington Works | 08/09/1941 | 13/09/1941 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 20/05/1943 | 11/06/1943 | 23 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 11/08/1944 | 16/09/1944 | 37 days | General | Boiler number D1251 (Diagram 63) |
||
Darlington Works | 28/01/1946 | 14/02/1946 | 18 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 08/11/1946 | 06/12/1946 | 29 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 03/10/1947 | 07/11/1947 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 3050 (Diagram 63B) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/11/1947 | 14/11/1947 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Gateshead Works | 26/10/1949 | 15/12/1949 | 51 days | Light Casual | Renumbered to BR 69851 |
||
Darlington Works | 30/01/1951 | 23/02/1951 | 25 days | General | Positive lub. drive fitted Boiler number 24755 (Diagram 63B) |
||
Darlington Works | 05/03/1951 | 09/03/1951 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 30/05/1952 | 1 day | Weighing | ||||
Darlington Works | 12/02/1953 | 27/06/1953 | 136 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 29/06/1953 | 03/07/1953 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 24/06/1955 | 23/07/1955 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 24758 (Diagram 63B) |
||
Darlington Works | 25/07/1955 | 29/07/1955 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 20/11/1956 | 11/12/1956 | 22 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 15/01/1957 | 28/01/1957 | 14 days | Light Casual | After collision |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/1913 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2144 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Saltburn (SALT) Diagram 63 boiler fitted |
||
1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: ?/1922. Dep: ?/05/1922. | ||
07/05/1922 | Modification | Diagram 63 number D245 boiler fitted | ||
11/01/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/01/1924. Dep: 26/03/1924. | ||
26/01/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/01/1926. Dep: 18/06/1926. | ||
14/10/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/10/1927. Dep: 23/01/1928. | ||
28/05/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD) | ||
08/11/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 08/11/1929. Dep: 13/01/1930. | ||
22/03/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 22/03/1932. Dep: 29/04/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1282 (Diagram 63) |
||
16/01/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Rebuilding) - Arr: 16/01/1935. Dep: 26/03/1935. | ||
17/08/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/08/1937. Dep: 01/10/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2373 (Diagram 63) |
||
09/07/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK) | ||
17/09/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD) | ||
14/11/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sunderland (SUN) | ||
18/01/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) | ||
06/06/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/06/1939. Dep: 20/07/1939. | ||
29/11/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/11/1940. Dep: 21/01/1941. | ||
22/07/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/07/1941. Dep: 02/09/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2375 (Diagram 63) |
||
08/09/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/09/1941. Dep: 13/09/1941. | ||
20/05/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/05/1943. Dep: 11/06/1943. | ||
11/08/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/08/1944. Dep: 16/09/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1251 (Diagram 63) |
||
28/01/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/01/1946. Dep: 14/02/1946. | ||
20/10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9851 | ||
08/11/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/11/1946. Dep: 06/12/1946. | ||
03/10/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/10/1947. Dep: 07/11/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3050 (Diagram 63B) |
||
11/11/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/11/1947. Dep: 14/11/1947. | ||
26/10/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 26/10/1949. Dep: 15/12/1949. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 69851 |
||
28/05/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Auckland (51F) | ||
30/01/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/01/1951. Dep: 23/02/1951. Work undertaken: Positive lub. drive fitted Boiler number 24755 (Diagram 63B) |
||
05/03/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/03/1951. Dep: 09/03/1951. | ||
30/05/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 30/05/1952. | ||
12/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 12/02/1953. Dep: 27/06/1953. | ||
29/06/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/06/1953. Dep: 03/07/1953. | ||
24/06/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/06/1955. Dep: 23/07/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24758 (Diagram 63B) |
||
25/07/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/07/1955. Dep: 29/07/1955. | ||
20/11/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 20/11/1956. Dep: 11/12/1956. | ||
15/01/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/01/1957. Dep: 28/01/1957. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
11/11/1958 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69851 from West Auckland (51F) | ||
07/1959 | Scrapped | Scrapped |