Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 1 Online
» 346 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18149 Week
» 71165 Month
» 190692 Year
» 3217545 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
612 |
m/e |
04/1879 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8425 |
|
06/1946 |
British Railways |
68425 |
|
03/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
E. Fletcher |
Class |
G6 |
Company History |
NER/LNER/BR |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-4-4T |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
To Service |
During 04/1879 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 11/01/1960 |
Service Life |
80 yrs, 9 mths , 11 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
MID |
Middlesbrough |
w/e |
17/01/1948 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1879 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 612 Built at Darlington Works |
|
|
06/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8425 |
|
|
17/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Middlesbrough (MID) |
|
|
03/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68425 |
|
|
21/07/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Darlington (51A) |
|
|
08/03/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blyth (North) (52F) |
|
|
19/07/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) |
|
|
11/01/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68425 |
|
|