Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 133 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17936 Week
» 70952 Month
» 190479 Year
» 3217332 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
1695 |
m/e |
06/1901 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
7337 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
British Railways |
67337 |
m/e |
01/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell |
Class |
G5 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-4-4T |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Order Number |
A--- |
To Service |
During 06/1901 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 11/03/1957 |
Service Life |
55 yrs, 9 mths , 8 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
10/1928 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
06/1943 |
Push/Pull equipment fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1901 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1695 Built at Darlington Works |
|
|
10/1928 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
06/1943 |
Modification |
Modification: Push/Pull equipment fitted |
|
|
05/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7337 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Neville Hill (NEV) |
|
|
01/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 67337 |
|
|
25/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Starbeck (50D) |
|
|
03/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Starbeck (50D) |
|
|
24/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Starbeck (50D) |
|
|
07/04/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (53B) |
|
|
21/04/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (53B) |
|
|
19/01/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Middlesbrough (51D) |
|
|
11/03/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67337 |
|
|