Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 534 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18337 Week
» 71353 Month
» 190880 Year
» 3217733 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
2081 |
m/e |
10/1900 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
7310 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
British Railways |
67310 |
m/e |
06/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell |
Class |
G5 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-4-4T |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Order Number |
A281 |
To Service |
During 10/1900 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 06/09/1955 |
Service Life |
54 yrs, 11 mths , 7 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
52B |
Heaton |
w/e |
07/07/1951 |
ALLOC |
54A |
Sunderland |
w/e |
17/11/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
06/09/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
11/1929 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1900 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2081 Built at Darlington Works |
|
|
11/1929 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
07/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7310 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Sunderland (SUN) |
|
|
06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 67310 |
|
|
07/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton (52B) |
|
|
21/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton (52B) |
|
|
17/11/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sunderland (54A) |
|
|
06/09/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67310 |
|
|