Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 2116 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 16159 Week
» 81113 Month
» 283777 Year
» 3310630 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
1775 |
m/e |
12/1897 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
7308 |
on |
03/02/1946 |
British Railways |
67308 |
m/e |
12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell |
Class |
G5 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-4-4T |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Order Number |
A218 |
To Service |
During 12/1897 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 22/11/1955 |
Service Life |
57 yrs, 11 mths , 23 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
12/1897 |
WBY |
|
Whitby |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
NEV |
|
Neville Hill |
w/e |
12/06/1948 |
50Fs1 |
|
(subshedded at Pickering) |
4w/e |
14/02/1953 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
22/11/1955 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
NEV |
Neville Hill |
w/e |
12/06/1948 |
ALLOC |
50FPICK |
|
4w/e |
21/02/1953 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
22/11/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
12/1928 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1897 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1775 Built at Darlington Works |
|
|
12/1928 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
03/02/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7308 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Whitby (WBY) |
|
|
12/06/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) |
|
|
12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 67308 |
|
|
14/02/1953 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
22/11/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67308 |
|
|