Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 4004 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17410 Week
» 70426 Month
» 189953 Year
» 3216806 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
1918 |
m/e |
06/1897 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
7296 |
on |
27/01/1946 |
British Railways |
67296 |
m/e |
03/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell |
Class |
G5 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-4-4T |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Order Number |
A218 |
To Service |
During 06/1897 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 08/03/1955 |
Service Life |
57 yrs, 9 mths , 5 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
06/1897 |
RBY |
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
52A |
|
Gateshead |
4w/e |
20/09/1952 |
52A |
|
Gateshead |
4w/e |
04/10/1952 |
52F |
|
Blyth (North) |
4w/e |
20/03/1954 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
08/03/1955 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
52A |
Gateshead |
4w/e |
04/10/1952 |
ALLOC |
52FS |
|
4w/e |
27/03/1954 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
08/03/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
10/1928 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1897 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1918 Built at Darlington Works |
|
|
10/1928 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
27/01/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7296 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
03/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 67296 |
|
|
20/09/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
04/10/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
20/03/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blyth (North) (52F) |
|
|
08/03/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67296 |
|
|