Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1517 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19320 Week
» 72336 Month
» 191863 Year
» 3218716 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
1890 |
m/e |
12/1896 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
7288 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
British Railways |
67288 |
m/e |
12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell |
Class |
G5 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-4-4T |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Order Number |
A209 |
To Service |
During 12/1896 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 28/06/1954 |
Service Life |
57 yrs, 6 mths , 29 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
54B |
Tyne Dock |
w/e |
20/08/1950 |
ALLOC |
52B |
Heaton |
w/e |
17/11/1951 |
ALLOC |
51A |
Darlington |
4w/e |
23/02/1952 |
ALLOC |
51E |
Stockton |
4w/e |
22/03/1952 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
28/06/1954 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
12/1928 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
20/08/1954 |
Scrapped NER engines |
A number of N.E.R. engines have been cut up recently. They include D20 Nos. 62388, 62392; J77 Nos. 68422 an 68401 (this engine has round cab windows and vacuum ejector); G5 No. 67288; J7 No. 8256; A7 No. 69776 and J21 No. 65042/68/75. |
SLS/195410 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1896 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1890 Built at Darlington Works |
|
|
12/1928 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
08/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7288 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stockton (SKN) |
|
|
12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 67288 |
|
|
20/08/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyne Dock (54B) |
|
|
17/11/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton (52B) |
|
|
23/02/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Darlington (51A) |
|
|
22/03/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stockton (51E) |
|
|
28/06/1954 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67288 |
|
|