Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 129 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17932 Week
» 70948 Month
» 190475 Year
» 3217328 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
1886 |
m/e |
12/1896 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
7284 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
British Railways |
67284 |
m/e |
05/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell |
Class |
G5 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-4-4T |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Order Number |
A209 |
To Service |
During 12/1896 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 08/10/1956 |
Service Life |
59 yrs, 10 mths , 8 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
10/1928 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
07/1951 |
Push/Pull equipment fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1896 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1886 Built at Darlington Works |
|
|
10/1928 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
07/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7284 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Malton (MAL) |
|
|
05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 67284 |
|
|
14/05/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Starbeck (SBK) |
|
|
01/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (53B) |
|
|
21/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (53B) |
|
|
23/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Darlington (51A) |
|
|
31/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Darlington (51A) |
|
|
07/1951 |
Modification |
Modification: Push/Pull equipment fitted |
|
|
08/10/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67284 |
|
|