|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/08/1948 | Darlington Works | Locomotives for shops during August included Nos. 507, 980, 2366, 3285, 3349, 3426/69, 5641, 5872, 7282, 7344, 7628, 8424, 8712/32, 9089, 9787, 62762, 67281 an 69798. Locomotives ex shops during the same period included Nos. 60509, 60824/25/98, 60920, 61455/61, 62706, 63361, 63418, 65647/69/92, 65708/37/41/62/63/67/89/99, 65809/16/62, 67295, 67605/16/30/78, 68305/37/60/93, 68423, 69781/82/95, 69868/73/84. No. 61461 has been rebuilt to 'B.16/3'; Paint date, August. Locomotives painted black and fully lined are Nos. 60898, 60920 an 62706, while No. 60509 has been painted green. The last 'L.1', No. 67730, is Darlington 2048 of 1948; Paint date, August | SLS/194810 |
31/08/1957 | Newbiggin, Blyth And Monkseaton Branch | G5 tanks 67261, 67281 an 67253 have been working on this branch during July and August. 67261 and 67281 have both been recently through Darlington Works for overhaul and repainting, 67261 having been reprieved from scrap. | SLS/195709 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/1896 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1883 Built at Darlington Works |
||
03/1929 | Modification | Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted | ||
12/1937 | Modification | Modification: Push/Pull equipment fitted | ||
08/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 7281 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Middlesbrough (MID) | ||
04/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 67281 | ||
23/10/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stockton (51E) | ||
23/04/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blyth (North) (52F) | ||
11/12/1958 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 67281 |