Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 809 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14215 Week
» 67231 Month
» 186758 Year
» 3213611 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
1772 |
m/e |
04/1895 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
7252 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
British Railways |
67252 |
m/e |
08/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell |
Class |
G5 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-4-4T |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Order Number |
A185 |
To Service |
During 04/1895 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Mon 10/11/1952 |
Service Life |
57 yrs, 7 mths , 10 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
52B |
Heaton |
w/e |
07/07/1951 |
ALLOC |
52A |
Gateshead |
4w/e |
14/06/1952 |
ALLOC |
52B |
Heaton |
4w/e |
12/07/1952 |
ALLOC |
52C |
Blaydon |
4w/e |
09/08/1952 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
10/11/1952 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
07/1929 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1895 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1772 Built at Darlington Works |
|
|
07/1929 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
07/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7252 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Sunderland (SUN) |
|
|
08/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 67252 |
|
|
07/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton (52B) |
|
|
21/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton (52B) |
|
|
14/06/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
21/06/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
12/07/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton (52B) |
|
|
19/07/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton (52B) |
|
|
09/08/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blaydon (52C) |
|
|
23/08/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blaydon (52C) |
|
|
10/11/1952 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67252 |
|
|