Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1683 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19486 Week
» 72502 Month
» 192029 Year
» 3218882 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
376 |
|
02/02/1935 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2774 |
|
10/1946 |
British Railways |
62774 |
w/e |
07/08/1948 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 12/1958 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/02/1935 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 376, name: THE STAINTONDALE Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1612 |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2774 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Neville Hill (NEV) |
|
|
01/05/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Scarborough (SCA) |
|
|
15/05/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) |
|
|
07/08/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 62774 |
|
|
21/08/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Scarborough (SCA) |
|
|
02/10/1948 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
15/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
22/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
18/12/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Starbeck (50D) |
|
|
20/07/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B) |
|
|
13/11/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 62774 |
|
|
12/1958 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|