Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 574 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18377 Week
» 71393 Month
» 190920 Year
» 3217773 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
274 |
|
28/08/1934 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2759 |
|
11/1946 |
British Railways |
62759 |
w/e |
29/01/1949 |
Names Carried
Date From |
Name |
28/08/1934 |
THE CRAVEN |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1961 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
50D |
Starbeck |
4w/e |
01/01/1955 |
ALLOC |
53A |
Hull Dairycoates |
4w/e |
03/10/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
13/01/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/10/1957 |
Whitby MPD |
In store are 62731/5/55/9/62/4/70/2/5 an 69864/5/81. |
SLS/195711 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
28/08/1934 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 274, name: THE CRAVEN Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1590 |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2759 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - York (North) (YK) |
|
|
29/01/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 62759 |
|
|
18/12/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Starbeck (50D) |
|
|
19/09/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) |
|
|
13/01/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 62759 |
|
|
02/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|