Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 36 Online
» 4291 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 18334 Week
» 83288 Month
» 285952 Year
» 3312805 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
258 |
|
22/08/1934 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2758 |
|
12/1946 |
British Railways |
62758 |
w/e |
27/03/1948 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 03/1958 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
on |
22/08/1934 |
NEV |
|
Neville Hill |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
SBX |
|
|
w/e |
21/08/1948 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
11/12/1957 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
SBX |
|
w/e |
21/08/1948 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
11/12/1957 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
19/04/1954 |
Wetherby Races, Easter Monday |
Excursion trains between Leeds City and Wetherby Racecourse station on Easter Monday were well filled and worked by the following J39's from Neville Hill (50B):-64791, 64819/35/86, 64920/22/33/35/43, and also brought in D49 62748 (50B). The excursions from Bradford and Harrogate brought in 62746/58/62 (all 50D), whilst two trains from the Huddersfield area were worked by 45218 (25A) and 42863 (25B). The excursion from Heeley (Sheffield) was, however, worked by 45015 (3B-Bushbury), rather a far cry from Wolverhampton. In addition, the 4.28 p.m. ordinary passenger service from Leeds City to Church Fenton via Wetherby, hauled by 61256 (50B), called specially at Wetherby Racecourse station to pick up. |
SLS/195406 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
22/08/1934 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 258, name: THE CATTISTOCK Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1589 |
|
|
12/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2758 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Neville Hill (NEV) |
|
|
27/03/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 62758 |
|
|
21/08/1948 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
11/12/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 62758 |
|
|
03/1958 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|