Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 3264 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16670 Week
» 69686 Month
» 189213 Year
» 3216066 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
318 |
|
07/05/1928 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2720 |
|
12/1946 |
British Railways |
62720 |
w/e |
07/05/1949 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1959 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
53A |
Hull Dairycoates |
on |
14/06/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
06/10/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
12/1931 |
Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
28/02/1954 |
Darlington Works |
North Road Works have completed Class 2 MT 78014/5, and the diesel-electric shunters are now all in traffic, No. 13081 completing the order. Engines for works include 60806/18/37/88, 61010/37/69/84, 61124, 61273, 61418/28, 62381, 62715/20/44, 63437/50/61, 65061, 65676 (to scrap yard), 65743, 65778, 67658/90, 67715/36/9/47/59/89/91, 90089, 90116, 90270/80, 90400/1/31/9, 90554, 90600. |
SLS/195404 |
08/10/1955 |
North Eastern Miscellany |
Class B16 engines have now appeared at sheds in the Newcastle-upon-Tyne area and the following have been noted working between Heaton and Berwick on various classes of trains: 61410/13/14/15/40/67/69. Class K2 2-6-0 locos noted en route between Newcastle and Cowlairs recently for overhaul and repainting have been Nos. 61720/27/62/65. Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73101 worked a Newcastle-Berwick passenger train on the 21st Sept. en route for the Scottish Region. Class J21 0-6-0 Nos. 65117 an 65070 were hauled dead by a Class J39 for the north on 4/10 and a class Dll 4-4-0 62684 hauled Class K1 62031 dead from Haymarket shed to Gateshead on October 5th. During mid-October, Class D49 4-4-0 Nos. 62752 an 62720 have been observed working a morning Sunderland-Newcastle slow passenger train as a running-in turn, both engines being recently ex-works. |
SLS/195512 |
16/09/1957 |
Bridlington MPD |
Except for the Driffield 'pilot' (G5 67341) the entire allocation was transferred on 16th September to Botanic Gardens (53B) viz 62700/1/3/7/50 an 67311. Stored here are 62703/10/20/67. |
SLS/195711 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/05/1928 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 318, name: CAMBRIDGESHIRE Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1399 |
|
|
12/1931 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector |
|
|
12/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2720 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Hull Botanic Gardens (HLB) |
|
|
07/05/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 62720 |
|
|
20/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) |
|
|
10/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
06/10/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 62720 |
|
|