Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 1642 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15048 Week
» 68064 Month
» 187591 Year
» 3214444 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
250 |
|
02/03/1928 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2714 |
|
11/1946 |
British Railways |
62714 |
w/e |
15/10/1949 |
Names Carried
Date From |
Name |
02/03/1928 |
PERTHSHIRE |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1959 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
on |
02/03/1928 |
PTH |
|
Perth (LNER) |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
63B |
|
Stirling |
4w/e |
06/10/1951 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
26/08/1959 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
DAR |
Darlington |
on |
24/11/1945 |
ALLOC |
63B |
Stirling |
4w/e |
06/10/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
26/08/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
05/1933 |
Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/03/1928 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 250, name: PERTHSHIRE Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1393 |
|
|
05/1933 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2714 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Perth (LNER) (PTH) |
|
|
15/10/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 62714 |
|
|
06/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stirling (63B) |
|
|
26/08/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 62714 |
|
|
10/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|